United States of America v. 131.00 Acres of Land, More or Less et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Martha Haynes, 131.00 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OF LESS and 131.00 Acres of Land, More or Less
Case Number: 5:2020cv00089
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John A Kazen
Referring Judge: Diana Saldana
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Deposit made into the Registry of the Court by USA in the amount of $100.00, receipt number 20-00093, filed. (knguyen, 4)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 Clerk's Receipt for $100, filed. (rnieto, 1)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE AND DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge John A. Kazen. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Notice)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 DECLARATION of LOREN FLOSSMAN, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Declaration)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DerGarabedian, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 131.00 Acres of Land, More or Less et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 131.00 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OF LESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 131.00 Acres of Land, More or Less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Alexander Nishan DerGarabedian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?