Texas Alliance for Retired Americans et al v. Hughs
Plaintiff: Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, DCCC, Sylvia Bruni and DSCC
Defendant: Ruth Hughs
Case Number: 5:2020cv00128
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Marina Garcia Marmolejo
Referring Judge: Christopher dos Santos
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Electronic record on appeal certified to the Fifth Circuit Court of Appeals re: #44 Notice of Appeal USCA No. 20-40643, filed.(dmorales, 5)
October 1, 2020 Electronic Access to Record on Appeal Provided re: #44 Notice of Appeal to counsel for appellant and appellee. Attorneys of record at the Circuit may #download the record from the Court of Appeals. (USCA No. 20-40643), filed.(dmorales, 5)
September 28, 2020 Filing 47 RESPONSE in Opposition to #45 Opposed MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction, filed by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans. (Howton, Skyler)
September 28, 2020 Notice of Assignment of USCA No. 20-40643 re: #44 Notice of Appeal, filed.(dmorales, 5)
September 26, 2020 Filing 46 Clerks Notice of Filing of an Appeal. The following Notice of Appeal and related motions are pending in the District Court: #44 Notice of Appeal. Fee status: Paid. Reporter(s): No Hearing Held, filed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Memorandum and Order, #3 Docket Sheet) (dmorales, 5)
September 26, 2020 Filing 45 Opposed MOTION to Stay Preliminary Injunction Motions referred to Christopher dos Santos. by Ruth Hughs, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bexar Co. Declaration, #2 Exhibit Hays Co. Declaration, #3 Exhibit Tarrant Co. Declaration, #4 Exhibit Collin Co. Declaration, #5 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
September 26, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEAL to US Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit re: #43 Memorandum and Order, by Ruth Hughs (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0541-25264681), filed.(Disher, Todd)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's #26 MOTION to Dismiss; denying #39 MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Dan Wallach; granting Plaintiff's #5 Request for Preliminary Injunction. (Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(dmorales, 5)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying Defendant's #27 Motion to Strike Dr. Lichtman's declaration and any future testimony.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(dmorales, 5)
September 23, 2020 Filing 41 REPLY in Support of #39 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Dan Wallach or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File a Sur-Reply, filed by Ruth Hughs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Disher, Todd)
September 16, 2020 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Opposition to #39 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Dan Wallach or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File a Sur-Reply, filed by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans. (Howton, Skyler)
September 14, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Strike Declaration of Dan Wallach or, in the Alternative, for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Motions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by Ruth Hughs, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
September 14, 2020 Filing 38 REPLY in Support of #26 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, , filed by Ruth Hughs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Disher, Todd)
September 14, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, filed. (Howton, Skyler)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #25 #28 #32 Motions for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(dmorales, 5)
September 8, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition to #27 MOTION to Strike Expert Declaration and Testimony of Dr. Allan Lichtman, filed by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lichtman Deposition Transcript)(Howton, Skyler)
September 7, 2020 Filing 34 REPLY in Support of #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans. (Attachments: #1 Appendix I - to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Appendix II - to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Howton, Skyler)
September 7, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition to #26 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, , filed by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans. (Attachments: #1 Appendix I to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Howton, Skyler)
September 7, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Excess PagesMotions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Howton, Skyler)
September 3, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Filing of Correction to Exhibit 4 of Appendix in Support re: #29 Response in Opposition to Motion by Ruth Hughs, filed. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Exhibit 4, Part I of Appendix in Support, #2 Corrected Exhibit 4, Part II of Appendix in Support)(Disher, Todd)
September 2, 2020 Filing 30 APPENDIX re: #29 Response in Opposition to Motion by Ruth Hughs, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28)(Disher, Todd)
September 2, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Ruth Hughs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
September 2, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Excess PagesMotions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by Ruth Hughs, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
September 2, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION to Strike Expert Declaration and Testimony of Dr. Allan Lichtman Motions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by Ruth Hughs, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
August 31, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Ruth Hughs, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
August 31, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess PagesMotions referred to Diana Song Quiroga. by Ruth Hughs, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Disher, Todd)
August 31, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by William T. Thompson on behalf of Ruth Hughs, filed. (Thompson, William)
August 31, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Lawrence Disher on behalf of Ruth Hughs, filed. (Disher, Todd)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Lalitha D. Madduri to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(ehernandez, 5)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Emily Brailey to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(ehernandez, 5)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Daniel Osher to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(ehernandez, 5)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Bruce V. Spiva to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(ehernandez, 5)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Marc E. Elias to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(ehernandez, 5)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. Plaintiffs have filed a Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Dkt. No. 5).Defendant is ORDERED to respond to the motion by September 2, 2020. Plaintiffsmay file a reply by September 7, 2020. (Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(ehernandez, 5)
August 18, 2020 Filing 16 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Ruth Hughs served on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020, filed.(Howton, Skyler)
August 13, 2020 Filing 15 ADVISORY by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, filed.(Spiva, Bruce)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge John A. Kazen hereby recuses himself in this case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguez, 5)
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Emily Brailey to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Brailey, Emily)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Daniel Osher to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Osher, Daniel)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Bruce V. Spiva to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Spiva, Bruce)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Lalitha Madduri to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Madduri, Lalitha)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Marc Elias to Appear Pro Hac ViceMotions referred to John A Kazen. by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Elias, Marc)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Given that Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction is time-sensitive they ask the Court for an injunction to occur before the November 2020 election the Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiffs to file an Advisory as soon as possible to apprise the Court of the status of service of process on Defendant. (Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(atrevino, 5) Modified on 8/13/2020 (atrevino, 5).
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #4 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is so ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified.(mmarquez, 5)
August 13, 2020 Summons Issued as to Ruth Hughs. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(dmorales, 5)
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix I to Memo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Appendix II to Memo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Appendix III to Memo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Appendix IV to Memo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Appendix V to Memo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Appendix VI to Memo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #7 Appendix VII to Memo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #8 Appendix VIII to Memo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #9 Appendix IX to Memo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #10 Appendix X to Memo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #11 Appendix XI to Memo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #12 Appendix XII to Memo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #13 Appendix XIII to Memo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #14 Appendix XIV to Memo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #15 Appendix XV to Memo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Howton, Skyler)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Howton, Skyler)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Howton, Skyler)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sylvia Bruni, DCCC, DSCC, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans, filed.(Howton, Skyler)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Ruth Hughs, filed.(Howton, Skyler)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ruth Hughs (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25054762) filed by DCCC, Sylvia Bruni, DSCC, Texas Alliance for Retired Americans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of John Oldham, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Dr. Muer Yang, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Dr. Catherine Troisi, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Dr. Allan Lichtman, #5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Maxwell Palmer, PhD, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Howton, Skyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas Alliance for Retired Americans et al v. Hughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Alliance for Retired Americans
Represented By: Skyler Michelle Howton
Represented By: Lalitha Madduri
Represented By: Emily Brailey
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Bruce Spiva
Represented By: Daniel Osher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DCCC
Represented By: Skyler Michelle Howton
Represented By: Lalitha Madduri
Represented By: Emily Brailey
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Bruce Spiva
Represented By: Daniel Osher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Bruni
Represented By: Skyler Michelle Howton
Represented By: Lalitha Madduri
Represented By: Emily Brailey
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Bruce Spiva
Represented By: Daniel Osher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DSCC
Represented By: Skyler Michelle Howton
Represented By: Lalitha Madduri
Represented By: Emily Brailey
Represented By: Marc Elias
Represented By: Bruce Spiva
Represented By: Daniel Osher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Hughs
Represented By: William Thomas Thompson
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Disher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?