USA v. 2015 VOLVO VNL 300 TRACTOR VIN: 4V4N99EH9FN913354
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: 2015 VOLVO VNL 300 TRACTOR VIN: 4V4N99EH9FN913354
Case Number: 5:2021cv00110
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John A Kazen
Referring Judge: Marina Garcia Marmolejo
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by USA, filed.(Smyth, Mary)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 RETURN of Service Executed as to 2015 Volvo VNL 300 Tractor, VIN: 4V4N99EH9FN913354 on 9/27/21 re: Warrant of Arrest In Rem, filed.(dmorales, 5)
September 23, 2021 Summons Issued as to 2015 VOLVO VNL 300 TRACTOR VIN: 4V4N99EH9FN913354. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(RobertTenorio, 5)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to 2015 VOLVO VNL 300 TRACTOR VIN: 4V4N99EH9FN913354, filed.(Smyth, Mary)
September 10, 2021 Summons Issued as to 2015 VOLVO VNL 300 TRACTOR VIN: 4V4N99EH9FN913354. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(sgonzalez, 5)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to 2015 VOLVO VNL 300 TRACTOR VIN: 4V4N99EH9FN913354, filed.(Smyth, Mary)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 2015 VOLVO VNL 300 TRACTOR VIN: 4V4N99EH9FN913354 filed by USA.(Smyth, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 2015 VOLVO VNL 300 TRACTOR VIN: 4V4N99EH9FN913354
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Mary Ellen Smyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 VOLVO VNL 300 TRACTOR VIN: 4V4N99EH9FN913354
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?