Bear Ranch, LLC v. Heartbrand Beef, Inc. et al

Defendant: Heartbrand Beef, Inc., Ronald Beeman and American Akaushi Association, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bear Ranch, LLC
Case Number: 6:2012cv00014
Filed: March 6, 2012
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Office: Victoria Office
County: Victoria
Presiding Judge: John D. Rainey
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2016 291 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT (Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
June 30, 2016 287 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 246 MOTION for Attorney Fees, 258 Supplemental MOTION for Attorney Fees (Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
April 30, 2016 274 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 260 MOTION for New Trial (Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
April 20, 2016 271 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Submission by HeartBrand due within ten days. Bear Ranch response due within ten days after submission. (Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
March 4, 2016 257 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 247 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
September 4, 2015 240 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 193 MOTION for Entry of Order re: Final Judgment(Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
March 18, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denies 72 Deft's Motion for Summary Judgment, granting in part denying in part 73 Bear Ranch's Motion for Summary Judgment. (Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(arrivera, 3)
November 26, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part 60 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Fraudulent Inducement (Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(lusmith, 3)
August 26, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 42 MOTION for Judgment, granting 43 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(arrivera, )
November 1, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 21 Opposed MOTION to Intervene (Signed by Judge Gregg Costa) Parties notified.(arrivera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bear Ranch, LLC v. Heartbrand Beef, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartbrand Beef, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Beeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Akaushi Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bear Ranch, LLC
Represented By: R Paul Yetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?