United States of America vs. $13,624.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $13,624.00 In U.S. Currency
Case Number: 6:2019cv00015
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 49:781
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Publication re: #1 Complaint by United States Of America, filed. (Muschenheim, Jon)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #1 Complaint by United States Of America, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Muschenheim, Jon)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of USM 285 Executed as to US Marshal's Office re:$13,624.00 In U.S. Currency served on 2/12/2019, answer due 4/15/2019, filed.(mmarquez, 5)
February 7, 2019 Warrant of Arrest In Rem issued (Signed by Judge Judge Kenneth M Hoyt), filed.(kpicota, 4)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR ARREST WARRANT IN REM. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(kpicota, 4)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Requesting Clerk to Issue Warrant of Arrest in Rem by United States Of America, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Warrant of Arrest in Rem, #2 Exhibit Warrant of Arrest in Rem)(Muschenheim, Jon)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Muschenheim, Jon)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $13,624.00 In U.S. Currency filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Muschenheim, Jon) (Image replaced on 2/5/2019; PDF not compatible with ECF) (ltesch, 6).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America vs. $13,624.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $13,624.00 In U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jon Muschenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?