Krause et al v. Zamora et al
Plaintiff: Karen Krause, Stephen Kolle and Roger Krause
3Rd Party Defendant: United States Department Of Agriculture
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Cynthia Zamora McCombs and David Michael Zamora
Case Number: 6:2019cv00058
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #10 Plaintiffs' Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice. Case terminated on July 19, 2019. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by Stephen Kolle, Karen Krause, Roger Krause, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice)(Hatley, Micah)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald B. Walker and Micah W. Hatley on behalf of Stephen Kolle, Karen Krause, Roger Krause, filed. (Hatley, Micah)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to United States Department Of Agriculture, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons returned to plaintiff by electronic notice. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued USDA, #2 Summons Issued USAG)(CarrieSmith, 6)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition to #2 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint, filed by Cynthia Zamora McCombs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bradley, David)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Cynthia Zamora McCombs, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Bradley, David)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 DISREGARD - Request for Issuance of Summons as to Cynthia Zamora McCombs, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Summons to Vaden, #2 Continuation Summons to Barr)(Bradley, David) Modified on 7/15/2019 - refer to Docket #5 (CarrieSmith, 6).
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 First AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against United States Department Of Agriculture filed by Cynthia Zamora McCombs.(Bradley, David)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by United States Department Of Agriculture, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Baiamonte, Lander)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 267th Judicial District, Victoria County, case number 18-11-83587-C () filed by United States Department Of Agriculture. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Original Pet & File, #2 Exhibit 2-Order to Cons., #3 Exhibit 3-Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4-State Court Notice, #5 Exhibit 5-Index of Matters Filed, #6 Exhibit 6-Counsel of Record)(Baiamonte, Lander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krause et al v. Zamora et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: United States Department Of Agriculture
Represented By: Lander Beck Baiamonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Cynthia Zamora McCombs
Represented By: David Hill Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: David Michael Zamora
Represented By: L Chris Heinemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Krause
Represented By: David Roberts
Represented By: Micah Wayne Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Kolle
Represented By: David Roberts
Represented By: Micah Wayne Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Krause
Represented By: David Roberts
Represented By: Micah Wayne Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?