Central Mutual Insurance Company v. Davis
Plaintiff: Central Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Mary Ann Davis
Case Number: 6:2019cv00065
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Continuance. Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 10/14/2019. Telephone Conference set for 10/30/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Continuance by Central Mutual Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bowman, Russell)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 09:15 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(CarrieSmithadi, 6)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mary Ann Davis. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(CarrieSmith, 6)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Mary Ann Davis, filed.(Bowman, Russell)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mary Ann Davis (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22817372) filed by Central Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interested Persons)(Bowman, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Mutual Insurance Company v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Russell J Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?