Parks et al v. State Farm Lloyds
Plaintiff: Barbara J. Parks and Donald M. Parks
Defendant: STATE FARM LLOYDS
Case Number: 6:2019cv00075
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #7 MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(6) if Fraud and Extra-Contractual Allegations filed by Barbara J. Parks, Donald M. Parks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Alexander v. State Farm Partial MSJs, #2 Proposed Order)(Delpit, Carla)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER Granting re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(6) if Fraud and Extra-Contractual Allegations, filed.(Klein, Michael)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss 12(b)(6) if Fraud and Extra-Contractual Allegations by State Farm Lloyds, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/7/2019. (Klein, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Barbara J. Parks, Donald M. Parks, filed.(Sanov, Phillip)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to State Farm Lloyds served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019, filed.(Sanov, Phillip)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 08:45 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(CarrieDickieadi, 6)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to State Farm Lloyds. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF.(CarrieDickie, 6)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to State Farm Lloyds, filed.(Sanov, Phillip)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Farm Lloyds (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23035470) filed by Donald M. Parks, Barbara J. Parks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanov, Phillip) Modified on 8/23/2019 (CarrieDickie, 6).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parks et al v. State Farm Lloyds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM LLOYDS
Represented By: Michael C Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara J. Parks
Represented By: Phillip Norris Sanov
Represented By: Carla Ruth Delpit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald M. Parks
Represented By: Phillip Norris Sanov
Represented By: Carla Ruth Delpit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?