Aviles v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Victor Aviles
Defendant: ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY and Roy Clark Miller
Case Number: 6:2019cv00083
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 MOTION Election of Responsibility. Defendant, Roy Clark Miller terminated.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 08:45 AM before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #4 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
October 20, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to #4 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by Victor Aviles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Pollom, Robert)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition to #4 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maus, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Expedited Response re: #4 Opposed MOTION to Remand. Response to Motion due by 10/21/2019.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Victor Aviles, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Pollom, Robert)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Expedited Response re: #2 MOTION Election of Responsibility. Response to Motion due by 10/10/2019.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
September 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION Election of Responsibility by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maus, Michael)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 377th District Court Victoria County, case number 19-07-84768-D (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23173905) filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Index, #2 Exhibit B. Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C. Court Docs, #4 Exhibit D. Notice to State Court, #5 Exhibit E. Disclosure, #6 Exhibit F. Counsel of Record)(Maus, Michael) Modified on 9/16/2019 (CarrieDickie, 6).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aviles v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Aviles
Represented By: Jacob Scott Rogiers
Represented By: Robert A Pollom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Michael Clifton Maus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Clark Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?