Hamilton v. ConocoPhillips Company et al
Plaintiff: Lloyd Michael Hamilton
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company and BURLINGTON RESOURCES OIL & GAS COMPANY LP
Case Number: 6:2022cv00001
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Drew B Tipton
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1531 Endangered Species Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Transcript Order by Lloyd Michael Hamilton, filed.(Albright, Alexandra)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Scott Janoe on behalf of Burlington Resources LLC, Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Company LP, ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company, filed. (Janoe, Jacob)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Michael J. Mazzone for Transcript of Motion Hearing on 2/25/2022 before Judge Tipton. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Veritext Legal Solutions, filed. (Mazzone, Michael) Electronically forwarded to Veritext on 3/16/2022 (RochelleLimon, 2).
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Lloyd Michael Hamilton, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Mundy, John)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin D. Cullen on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company, filed. (Cullen, Kevin)
March 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Lloyd Michael Hamilton, filed.(Mundy, John)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by ConocoPhillips Company and Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Company LP, filed.(CarrieDickie, 6)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra W. Albright on behalf of Lloyd Michael Hamilton, filed. (Albright, Alexandra)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Amended MOTION to Dismiss #10 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, by Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Company LP, ConocoPhillips Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Mazzone, Michael)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Motion to Dismiss #8 terminated as moot.***, filed. (KelliePapaioannou, 2)
February 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Denying #11 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order.(Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(KelliePapaioannou, 2)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Drew B Tipton. MOTION HEARING held on 2/25/2022. The Court hears arguments from all parties regarding the EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order #11 .The Court will take this matter under advisement and issue ruling.Appearances:Kevin Cullen. Michael J Mazzone, Robert Benjamin Dubose, John Jeffery Mundy.(Digital # 3:22-5:19)(ERO:Rochelle Limon), filed.(KelliePapaioannou, 2)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY in Support of #11 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Lloyd Michael Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Ehibit 17, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 20)(Mundy, John)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Janoe on behalf of Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Company LP, ConocoPhillips Company, filed. (Mazzone, Michael)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Resetting re: #11 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Parties notified. Motion Hearing reset for 2/25/2022 at 03:30 PM before Judge Drew B Tipton, filed. All Parties to Appear via Zoom. https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1615238666?pwd=MmFPTndoeDNzTUlDWm1uZWMweFB1dz09Meeting ID: 161 523 8666 Passcode: 551079Dial by your location +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 669 216 1590 US (San Jose) +1 551 285 1373 US +1 646 828 7666 US (New York)Per L.R. 83.7 Except by leave of the presiding judge, no photo- or electro-mechanical means of recordation or transmission of court proceedings is permitted (KelliePapaioannou, 2)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition to #11 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Company LP, ConocoPhillips Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12)(Mazzone, Michael)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin D. Cullen on behalf of ConocoPhillips Company, filed. (Cullen, Casey)
February 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Dubose on behalf of Lloyd Michael Hamilton, filed. (Dubose, Robert)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Setting re: #11 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 2/25/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Drew B Tipton, filed. All Parties to Appear via Zoom. https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1615238666?pwd=MmFPTndoeDNzTUlDWm1uZWMweFB1dz09Meeting ID: 161 523 8666 Passcode: 551079Dial by your location +1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose) +1 669 216 1590 US (San Jose) +1 551 285 1373 US +1 646 828 7666 US (New York)Per L.R. 83.7 Except by leave of the presiding judge, no photo- or electro-mechanical means of recordation or transmission of court proceedings is permitted. (KelliePapaioannou, 2)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Additional EXHIBITS re: #11 EMERGENCY MOTION MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Lloyd Michael Hamilton, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 16)(Mundy, John)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 EMERGENCY MOTION( Motion Docket Date 3/11/2022.), MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Lloyd Michael Hamilton, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List for TRO, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14)(Mundy, John)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ***DUPLICATE FILING - EXCEPT for Attached Exhibits*** First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lloyd Michael Hamilton. Related document: #9 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., filed by Lloyd Michael Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3: Google Earth West to East 3rd Lower View, #2 Exhibit 4: Google Earth 3rd West to East View, #3 Exhibit 5: Google Earth Sat View Wide Area View, #4 Exhibit 6: Google Earth Sat Close View)(Mundy, John) Modified on 2/18/2022 - Refer to #9 Amended Complaint - this entry includes additional Exhibits (CarrieDickie, 6).
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Lloyd Michael Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: ORDER Granting Motion to Remand from Hamilton v. ConocoPhillips Co. and Burlington REsourses Oil & Gas Co. LP, Case No. 6:20-cv-00059, #2 Exhibit 1: July 29, 2020 Letter from USFWS to Conoco, #3 Exhibit 2: September 3, 2020 Letter from USFWS to Conoco)(Mundy, John) Modified on 2/18/2022 - refer to #10 for additional Exhibits 3 through 6 (CarrieDickie, 6).
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Company LP, ConocoPhillips Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Mazzone, Michael)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/28/2022 at 02:15 PM in by video before Judge Drew B Tipton. (Signed by Judge Drew B Tipton) Parties notified.(CarrieDickie, 6)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Burlington Resources Oil & Gas Company LP served on 1/24/2022, answer due 2/14/2022, filed.(Mundy, John)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to ConocoPhillips Company served on 1/24/2022, answer due 2/14/2022, filed.(Mundy, John)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BrittanyBoniface, 6)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to BURLINGTON RESOURCES OIL & GAS COMPANY LP, filed.(Mundy, John)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to ConocoPhillips Company, filed.(Mundy, John)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27629463) filed by Lloyd Michael Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ESA Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit ESA Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mundy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. ConocoPhillips Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Michael Hamilton
Represented By: John Jeffery Mundy
Represented By: Alexandra Wilson Albright
Represented By: Charles W Irvine
Represented By: Robert Benjamin Dubose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Represented By: Kevin Dudley Cullen
Represented By: Michael J Mazzone
Represented By: Jacob Scott Janoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURLINGTON RESOURCES OIL & GAS COMPANY LP
Represented By: Michael J Mazzone
Represented By: Jacob Scott Janoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?