Irma Orive, et al v. Transportes Canales, S.A. De C.V., et al
Plaintiff: Alexandra Marcos Lopez and Irma Orive
Defendant: Hyundai Translead, Silvestre Hernandez and Transportes Canales, S.A. De C.V.
Case Number: 7:2018cv00230
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: McAllen Office
County: Hidalgo
Presiding Judge: Ricardo H Hinojosa
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal with Jury demand by Transportes Canales, S.A. De C.V., filed.(Chaves, Douglas)
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hyundai Translead, filed.(Cilfone, Charlie)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Alexandra Marcos Lopez, Irma Orive, filed.(Ammons, Robert)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/3/2018 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(SandraSilva, 7)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 370th District Court, case number C-0313-18-G (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-20494806) filed by Hyundai Translead. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Cilfone, Charlie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irma Orive, et al v. Transportes Canales, S.A. De C.V., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Marcos Lopez
Represented By: Andrea Alexandra Zarikian
Represented By: Robert Earl Ammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Orive
Represented By: Andrea Alexandra Zarikian
Represented By: Robert Earl Ammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyundai Translead
Represented By: Charlie Jacob Cilfone
Represented By: Lewin Plunkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvestre Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportes Canales, S.A. De C.V.
Represented By: Douglas E Chaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?