United States of America v. 26.000 Acres of Land, More or Less et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: The Pharr Oratory of St. Philip Neri of Pontifical Rite, A Texas Non Profit Corporation, Mario A. Aviles, Registered Agent and 26.000 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS
Case Number: 7:2018cv00303
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Randy Crane
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S 11 Opposed MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE POSSESSION (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7).
December 18, 2018 Filing 21 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER re: 11 Opposed MOTION FOR ORDER OF IMMEDIATE POSSESSION, filed.(Smith, John)
December 12, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randy Crane. INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 12/12/2018. Case called on docket. Parties present. The Court heard arguments on Plaintiff's Opposed Motion for Order of Immediate Possession. The Court ordered parties to efile an agreed order allowing temporary access to survey land for proposed border wall. If agreement is not reached, the Court ordered both parties to efile their respective proposed orders within a week. Appearances:John Albert Smith, III/Paxton Warner, AUSA; David Champion Garza, Defendant. (ERO:Ricardo Rodriguez), filed.(DeliaRodriguez, 7)
December 12, 2018 Filing 20 REPLY TO DEFENDANT PHARR ORATORY'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION, filed by United States of America. (klopez, 7)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to File Late Reply to Defendant's Response in Opposition.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
December 4, 2018 Filing 18 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File LATE REPLY by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Nathan, Jessica)
December 4, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - (Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 12/12/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Randy Crane), (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed 14 Motion to Abbreviate the Joint Case Management Plan.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
November 21, 2018 Filing 15 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by United States of America, filed.(Smith, John)
November 21, 2018 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION FOR AN ABBREVIATED JOINT MANAGEMENT PLAN by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/12/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Smith, John)
November 21, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Smith, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to 11 Opposed MOTION FOR ORDER OF IMMEDIATE POSSESSION, filed by The Pharr Oratory of St. Philip Neri of Pontifical Rite, A Texas Non Profit Corporation, Mario A. Aviles, Registered Agent. (Garza, David)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 Opposed MOTION FOR ORDER OF IMMEDIATE POSSESSION by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Smith, John)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA A. NATHAN on behalf of United States of America, filed. (Nathan, Jessica)
November 15, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Pharr Oratory of St. Philip Neri of Pontifical Rite, A Texas Non Profit Corporation, Mario A. Aviles, Registered Agent, filed.(Garza, David)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Pharr Oratory of St. Philip Neri of Pontifical Rite, A Texas Non Profit Corporation, Mario A. Aviles, Registered Agent, filed.(Garza, David)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 Deposit made into the Registry of the Court by USA in the amount of $100.00, receipt number HOU083812, filed. (gclair, 4) (gclair, 4).
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to The Pharr Oratory of St. Philip Neri of Pontifical Rite, A Texas Non Profit Corporation, Mario A. Aviles, Registered Agent served on 9/28/2018, answer due 11/27/2018, filed.(Smith, John)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MEGAN EYES on behalf of United States of America, filed. (Eyes, Megan)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/5/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Randy Crane(by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Notice)(Smith, John)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 DECLARATION of LOREN FLOSSMAN, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to DT)(Smith, John)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedules to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 26.000 Acres of Land, More or Less et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pharr Oratory of St. Philip Neri of Pontifical Rite, A Texas Non Profit Corporation, Mario A. Aviles, Registered Agent
Represented By: David Champion Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 26.000 ACRES OF LAND, MORE OR LESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: John Albert Smith, III
Represented By: Megan Hoyt Eyes
Represented By: Jessica Ashley Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?