United States of America v. Real Property Located at 3019 Mile 2 West, Progresso, Texas 78579

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located at 3019 Mile 2 West, Progresso, Texas 78579
Claimant: Hidalgo County Drainage District #1, Progresso Independent School District, Hidalgo County Emergency Services District #1, South Texas College, Hidalgo County, Texas and South Texas Independent School District
Case Number: 7:2018cv00314
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Ricardo H Hinojosa
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2018 21 MOTION Verified Claim of Hidalgo County, Texas, et al. by Hidalgo County Drainage District #1, Hidalgo County Emergency Services District #1, Hidalgo County, Texas, Progresso Independent School District, South Texas College, South Texas Independent School District, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2018. (Gruver, Lori)
December 5, 2018 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hidalgo County Drainage District #1, Hidalgo County Emergency Services District #1, Hidalgo County, Texas, Progresso Independent School District, South Texas College, South Texas Independent School District, filed.(Gruver, Lori)
December 5, 2018 19 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Hidalgo County, Texas, Hidalgo County Drainage District #1, Hidalgo County Emergency Services District #1, Progresso Independent School District, South Texas Independent School District, South Texas College, filed.(Gruver, Lori)
December 4, 2018 18 RETURN of Service Executed as to Brenda Valencia Vega on November 29, 2018 re: the Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem, filed.(Roth, Lori)
November 27, 2018 17 RETURN of Service Executed as to Claudia Valencia Vega on November 20, 2018 re: the Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem, filed.(Roth, Lori)
November 27, 2018 16 RETURN of Service Executed as to J.V.V. on November 20, 2018 re: the Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem, filed.(Roth, Lori)
November 27, 2018 15 RETURN of Service Executed as to Elva Leticia Vega Mendoza on November 20, 2018 re: the Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem, filed.(Roth, Lori)
November 27, 2018 14 RETURN of Service Executed as to The Estate of Ramon Valencia Morfin on November 20, 2018 re: the Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem, filed.(Roth, Lori)
November 16, 2018 13 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand by Real Property Located at 3019 Mile 2 West, Progresso, Texas 78579, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Villalobos, Javier)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order 12 AMENDED ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/3/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
November 14, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Patrick on behalf of United States of America, filed. (Patrick, Sean)
November 14, 2018 10 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roth, Lori)
November 14, 2018 9 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Roth, Lori)
November 5, 2018 8 RESPONSE Pedro Lopez and R/C trading LLC Claim for property seized, filed by Real Property Located at 3019 Mile 2 West, Progresso, Texas 78579. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Villalobos, Javier)
October 23, 2018 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Roth, Lori)
October 22, 2018 6 RETURN of Service Executed as to RGV Brokers of South Texas LLC on October 19, 2018 re: Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem, filed.(Roth, Lori)
October 22, 2018 5 RETURN of Service Executed as to R/C Trading LLC on October 19, 2018 re: Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem, filed.(Roth, Lori)
October 22, 2018 4 RETURN of Service Executed as to PLL Logistices LLC on October 19, 2018 re: Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem, filed.(Roth, Lori)
October 22, 2018 3 RETURN of Service Executed as to Post and Walk on October 19, 2018 re: Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem, filed.(Roth, Lori)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/9/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
October 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 3019 MILE 2 WEST, PROGRESSO, TEXAS 78579 filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Roth, Lori)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located at 3019 Mile 2 West, Progresso, Texas 78579
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 3019 Mile 2 West, Progresso, Texas 78579
Represented By: Javier Villalobos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Lori Silverstein Roth
Represented By: Sean Joseph Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hidalgo County Drainage District #1
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Progresso Independent School District
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hidalgo County Emergency Services District #1
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: South Texas College
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Hidalgo County, Texas
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: South Texas Independent School District
Represented By: Lori Gruver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?