Sanchez v. Aleman et al

Plaintiff: Anita Sanchez
Defendant: City of Alamo, Texas and Mike Aleman
Case Number: 7:2018cv00317
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER - Deft Expert Report due by 5/15/2019. Discovery due by 6/14/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/28/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/18/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/27/2019. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/28/2019. Pltf Expert Report due by 4/15/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
December 4, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER - The 12/11/2018 Initial Pretrial Conference is CANCELED. (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
November 29, 2018 9 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Mike Aleman, filed.(Drinkard, Robert)
November 2, 2018 8 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Mike Aleman, filed.(Drinkard, Robert)
October 26, 2018 7 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mike Aleman filed by Anita Sanchez.(McGraw, Peter)
October 23, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER granting #5 Motion for Samantha Serna to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
October 22, 2018 5 Unopposed MOTION for Samantha Serna to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Anita Sanchez, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/13/2018. (McGraw, Peter)
October 19, 2018 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Anita Sanchez, filed.(McGraw, Peter)
October 19, 2018 3 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mike Aleman filed by Anita Sanchez.(McGraw, Peter)
October 15, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
October 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 92nd Judicial District Court, case number C-3581-18-A (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21074592) filed by City of Alamo, Texas, Mike Aleman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh.A - Pltf's Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Exh.B - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exh.C - Def's Ntc of Removal (State Court), #4 Exhibit Exh.D - Certified Copy of State Court File, #5 Exhibit Exh.E - Certificate of Interested Parties)(Navarro, Ricardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Aleman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Alamo, Texas
Represented By: Ricardo J. Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Aleman
Represented By: Ricardo J. Navarro
Represented By: Robert Lee Drinkard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Sanchez
Represented By: Samantha Serna
Represented By: Peter Eammon McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?