United States of America v. 65.791 Acres of Land, More or Less et al Featured Case

Plaintiff United States of America filed a complaint in condemnation for the taking of property under the power of eminent domain to conduct surveying, testing, and other investigatory work needed to plan the proposed construction of roads, fencing, vehicle barriers, security lighting, sensors and related structures to secure the United States/Mexico border within the State of Texas.

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: The Roman Catholic Diocese of Brownsville, Texas, 65.791 Acres of Land, More or Less and City of Mission, Texas
Case Number: 7:2018cv00329
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: Texas Southern District Court
Presiding Judge: Randy Crane
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 30 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Initial Conference reset for 2/6/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Randy Crane(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
January 7, 2019 30 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Initial Conference reset for 2/6/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Randy Crane(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
January 7, 2019 29 REPLY in Support of 10 Opposed MOTION FOR ORDER OF IMMEDIATE POSSESSION, filed by United States of America. (Smith, John)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order 28 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff may file a brief in response no later than 01/18/2019. (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order 27 ORDER granting 21 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Abbreviate the Joint Case Management Plan. The parties may proceed according to the Joint Case Management Plan attached to the motion as Exhibit 1.(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
December 31, 2018 26 RESPONSE in Opposition to 10 Opposed MOTION FOR ORDER OF IMMEDIATE POSSESSION, filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Brownsville, Texas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Garza, David)
December 27, 2018 22 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by United States of America, filed.(Eyes, Megan)
December 27, 2018 21 Unopposed MOTION FOR AN ABBREVIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/17/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Eyes, Megan)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 25 ORDER granting 20 Motion for Jonathan Lev Backer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified. (NelidaLosoya, 7)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 24 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Amy L. Marshak to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified. (NelidaLosoya, 7)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 23 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Mary B. McCord to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified. (NelidaLosoya, 7)
December 20, 2018 20 MOTION for Jonathan Lev Backer to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Brownsville, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/10/2019. (Garza, David)
December 20, 2018 19 MOTION for Amy L. Marshak to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Brownsville, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/10/2019. (Garza, David)
December 20, 2018 18 MOTION for Mary B. McCord to Appear Pro Hac Vice by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Brownsville, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/10/2019. (Garza, David)
December 20, 2018 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to City of Mission, Texas served on 11/26/2018, answer due 1/25/2019, filed.(Smith, John)
December 20, 2018 16 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in opposition to Plaintiff's motion for immediate possession by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Brownsville, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/10/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Garza, David)
December 20, 2018 15 *FILED IN ERROR* Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in opposition to Plaintiff's motion for immediate possession by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Brownsville, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/10/2019. (Garza, David) Modified on 12/20/2018 (klopez, 7).
December 20, 2018 14 *FILED IN ERROR* Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief in opposition to Plaintiff's motion for immediate possession by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Brownsville, Texas, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/10/2019. (Garza, David) Modified on 12/20/2018 (klopez, 7).
November 23, 2018 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Smith, John)
November 21, 2018 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Brownsville, Texas, filed.(Garza, David)
November 20, 2018 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to 10 Opposed MOTION FOR ORDER OF IMMEDIATE POSSESSION, filed by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Brownsville, Texas. (Garza, David)
November 20, 2018 10 Opposed MOTION FOR ORDER OF IMMEDIATE POSSESSION by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/11/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order)(Smith, John)
November 16, 2018 9 CLERKS RECEIPT of payment from the United States of America in the amount of $ 100.00 Receipt date: 11/16/2018. Receipt number HOU084380. Purpose Description: Condemnation Proceeding. (thanniable, 4) (thanniable, 4).
November 16, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA A. NATHAN on behalf of United States of America, filed. (Nathan, Jessica)
November 6, 2018 7 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by The Roman Catholic Diocese of Brownsville, Texas, filed.(Garza, David)
October 29, 2018 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to The Roman Catholic Diocese of Brownsville, Texas served on 10/25/2018, answer due 12/24/2018, filed.(Smith, John)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/9/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Randy Crane(by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
October 25, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MEGAN EYES on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Smith, John)
October 25, 2018 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Smith, John)
October 25, 2018 2 DECLARATION of Loren Flossman, filed.(Smith, John)
October 25, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 65.791 Acres of Land, More or Less et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Roman Catholic Diocese of Brownsville, Texas
Represented By: David Champion Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 65.791 Acres of Land, More or Less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Mission, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Megan Hoyt Eyes
Represented By: John Albert Smith, III
Represented By: Jessica Ashley Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?