United States of America v. 4.76 Acres of Land, More or Less et al Featured Case

Plaintiff United States of America brought a civil action for the taking of property under the power of eminent domain through a Declaration of Taking, and for the determination and award of just compensation to the owners and parties in interest. Plaintiff seeks to conduct surveying, testing, and other investigatory work needed to plan the proposed construction of roads, fencing, vehicle barriers, security lighting, cameras, sensors and related structures designed to help secure the United States/Mexico border within the State of Texas.

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Eloy Gonzalez, Ana Karen De La Cruz and 4.76 Acres of Land, More or Less
Case Number: 7:2019cv00001
Filed: January 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Nathan, Jessica)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/12/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
January 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa recused. Case reassigned to Judge Micaela Alvarez for all further proceedings(Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION by United States of America, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schedules to Notice)(Nathan, Jessica)
January 2, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of LOREN FLOSSMAN, filed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schedules to DT)(Nathan, Jessica)
January 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Schedules to Complaint)(Nathan, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 4.76 Acres of Land, More or Less et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eloy Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Karen De La Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4.76 Acres of Land, More or Less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jessica Ashley Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?