Valadez v. Applebee's Restaurants Texas, LLC

Plaintiff: Michael Valadez
Defendant: Applebee's Restaurants Texas, LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv00021
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Randy Crane
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 02/28/2019 (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Michael Valadez, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/7/2019. (Palma, Cesar)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Applebee's Restaurants Texas, LLC, filed.(Luck, William)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/6/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Randy Crane (by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 93rd District Court of Hidalgo County, Texas, case number C-4550-18-B (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21684445) filed by Applebee's Restaurants Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Luck, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valadez v. Applebee's Restaurants Texas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Valadez
Represented By: Cesar Palma
Represented By: Ezequiel Reyna, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applebee's Restaurants Texas, LLC
Represented By: William H Luck, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?