Medina v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jesus Medina
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00061
Filed: February 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ricardo H Hinojosa
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Quicken Loans, Inc., filed.(Barger, Darrell)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. Quicken Loans shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 05/09/2019. (Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Joseph F. Yenouskas to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Joseph F. Yenouskas to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Quicken Loans, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/7/2019. (Barger, Darrell)
April 15, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to the Complaint by Quicken Loans, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barger, Darrell)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Darrell L. Barger on behalf of Quicken Loans, Inc., filed. (Barger, Darrell)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Quicken Loans, Inc. served on 2/24/2019, answer due 4/25/2019, filed.(Volheim, Nathan)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jesus Medina, filed.(Volheim, Nathan)
February 25, 2019 Summons Issued as to Quicken Loans, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(klopez, 7)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/23/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
February 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis on behalf of Jesus Medina, filed. (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis)
February 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan C. Volheim on behalf of Jesus Medina, filed. (Volheim, Nathan)
February 24, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Quicken Loans, Inc., filed.(Volheim, Nathan)
February 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Quicken Loans, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21929533) filed by Jesus Medina. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Volheim, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medina v. Quicken Loans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quicken Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph F Yenouskas
Represented By: Adam Laird Anthony
Represented By: Darrell Lee Barger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Medina
Represented By: Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?