Martinez et al v. Ethicon, Inc. d/b/a Ethicon Womens Health and Urology et al
Plaintiff: Artemio Martinez and Ernestina Martinez
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. d/b/a Ethicon Womens Health and Urology and Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00164
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Ethicon, Inc. d/b/a Ethicon Womens Health and Urology, Johnson & Johnson, Inc., filed.(Cowan, Christopher)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ethicon, Inc. d/b/a Ethicon Womens Health and Urology, Johnson & Johnson, Inc., filed.(Cowan, Christopher)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson, Inc., filed.(Cowan, Christopher)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc. d/b/a Ethicon Womens Health and Urology, filed.(Cowan, Christopher)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Artemio Martinez, Ernestina Martinez, filed.(McCarley, Matthew)
May 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc. d/b/a Ethicon Womens Health and Urology, Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(klopez, 7)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/16/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Ethicon, Inc. d/b/a Ethicon Womens Health and Urology, Johnson & Johnson, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons for Second Defendant)(McCarley, Matthew)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc. d/b/a Ethicon Womens Health and Urology, Johnson & Johnson, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22378655) filed by Ernestina Martinez, Artemio Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCarley, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. Ethicon, Inc. d/b/a Ethicon Womens Health and Urology et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artemio Martinez
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernestina Martinez
Represented By: Matthew Ryan McCarley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. d/b/a Ethicon Womens Health and Urology
Represented By: Christopher Robert Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Robert Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?