United States of America v. Cessna 182C, S/N: 52409
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: CESSNA 182C, S/N: 52409, DISPLAYING TAIL NUMBER N234QA
Case Number: 7:2019cv00180
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ricardo H Hinojosa
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 88:8888
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 Warrant of Arrest in REM issued, filed.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #1 Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Patrick, Sean)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR ARREST WARRANT in Rem(Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) (Attachments: #1 Warrant of Arrest in REM) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION FOR ORDER REQUESTING CLERK TO ISSUE WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM)(Patrick, Sean)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE REQUESTING CLERK TO ISSUE WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM)(Patrick, Sean)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Patrick, Sean)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CESSNA 182C, S/N: 52409, DISPLAYING TAIL NUMBER N234QA filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Patrick, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Cessna 182C, S/N: 52409
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CESSNA 182C, S/N: 52409, DISPLAYING TAIL NUMBER N234QA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Sean Joseph Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?