Cuevas et al v. Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC d/b/a Firestone Complete Auto Care et al

Plaintiff: Belinda Cuevas and Javier Cuevas
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc. and Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC d/b/a Firestone Complete Auto Care
Case Number: 7:2019cv00193
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #7 MOTION to Remand (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Pltf Expert Report due by 9/27/2019. Deft Expert Report due by 11/15/2019. Discovery due by 1/24/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/21/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/17/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
July 16, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Micaela Alvarez. Initial PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 7/16/2019. The parties appeared before the Court for an initial pre-trial scheduling conference. The Court orally denied Plaintiff's motion to remand and proceeded to delineate scheduling deadlines. Written orders regarding both the motion to remand and the scheduling deadlines to follow. Appearances:Hitesh Chugani / Christopher Trent, Fiona Bell (ERO: Xavier Avalos [10:38-10:50]) (DUSM: M.Ruiz)., filed.(JulieSanchez,hs 7)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER regarding #11 Motion for Continuance. (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Scheduling Conference by Belinda Cuevas, Javier Cuevas, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/31/2019. (Chugani, Hitesh)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 Amended JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC d/b/a Firestone Complete Auto Care, filed.(Baluk, David)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Johnson Controls, Inc., filed.(Bell, Fiona)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Fiona Ann Bell on behalf of Johnson Controls, Inc., filed. (Bell, Fiona)
July 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Belinda Cuevas, Javier Cuevas, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/25/2019. (Chugani, Hitesh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC d/b/a Firestone Complete Auto Care, filed.(Baluk, David)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Belinda Cuevas, Javier Cuevas, filed.(Chugani, Hitesh)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Plaintiff's Petition with Jury Demand by Johnson Controls, Inc., filed.(Walther, Benjamin) Modified on 6/21/2019 (sguevara, 4).
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC d/b/a Firestone Complete Auto Care, filed.(Trent, Thomas)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/16/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 398th Judicial District Court of Hidalgo County, case number C-1928-19-I (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22567249) filed by Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC d/b/a Firestone Complete Auto Care. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Citation to Bridgestone, #3 Exhibit C - Citation to Johsnon Controls, #4 Exhibit D - Bridgestone's Answer, #5 Exhibit E - Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit F - Index of Matters being Filed, #7 Exhibit G - List of Counsel, #8 Civil Cover Sheet (Exhibit H))(Trent, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuevas et al v. Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC d/b/a Firestone Complete Auto Care et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Controls, Inc.
Represented By: Fiona Ann Bell
Represented By: Benjamin Wayne Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgestone Retail Operations, LLC d/b/a Firestone Complete Auto Care
Represented By: David John Baluk
Represented By: Thomas Christopher Trent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Cuevas
Represented By: Hitesh K. Chugani
Represented By: Hitesh K Chugani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Cuevas
Represented By: Hitesh K. Chugani
Represented By: Hitesh K Chugani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?