Bazan v. United States Of America
Petitioner: Jose Armando Bazan
Respondent: United States Of America
Case Number: 7:2019cv00198
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Juan F Alanis
Referring Judge: Randy Crane
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Response to 2255 Motion by United States Of America, filed.(Turner, James)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Turner on behalf of United States Of America, filed. (Turner, James)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER as to Jose Armando Bazan. Responses due by 9/9/2019. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Juan F Alanis) Parties notified, filed.(cvillegas, 7)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) as to Criminal Case No. 7:17CR691 (Defendant No. 1) filed by Jose Armando Bazan. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of 2255, #2 Envelope)(NelidaLosoya, 7)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bazan v. United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Armando Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States Of America
Represented By: Appellate Division
Represented By: James L Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?