Cuellar v. Whitney

Plaintiff: Beatriz Cuellar
Defendant: Catherine A. Whitney
Case Number: 7:2019cv00219
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ricardo H Hinojosa
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Remand. (Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION to Remand by Beatriz Cuellar, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Proposed Order)(Ciccone, Edward)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Catherine A. Whitney, filed.(Tijerina, Guillermo)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law No. 6, case number CL-18-1769-F (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22663599) filed by Catherine A. Whitney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 County Court Citation, #4 Plaintiff's Petition, #5 Defendant's Answer, #6 Index of Matters Being Filed)(Tijerina, Guillermo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuellar v. Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine A. Whitney
Represented By: Guillermo Tijerina, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatriz Cuellar
Represented By: Edward L Ciccone
Represented By: Ezequiel Reyna, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?