Gonzales et al v. Schaab

Plaintiff: Jovita Gonzales and Carlos Gonzales
Defendant: Rita Schaab
Case Number: 7:2019cv00223
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Randy Crane
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randy Crane. INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/7/2019. Case called on docket. Parties present. Status of case discussed. The Court issued a scheduling order, copies tendered to counsel, reflecting a February 2020 jury trial date. Appearances:Robert Davis, Jr., Plaintiff; Guillermo Tijerina, Jr., Defendant. (ERO: Ricardo Rodriguez), filed.(DeliaRodriguez, 7)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2019. Deft Expert Report due by 11/15/2019. Discovery due by 12/6/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 12/20/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 10/11/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/27/2020. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 12/20/2019. Pltf Expert Report due by 11/1/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane. Jury Selection set for 2/4/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Randy Crane (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Rita Schaab, filed.(Tijerina, Guillermo)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Rita Schaab, filed.(Tijerina, Guillermo)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Robert Davis, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Robert Davis, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carlos Gonzales, Jovita Gonzales, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/23/2019. (klopez, 7)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/7/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Randy Crane (by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court at Law No. 3, case number 2019-CCL-00960 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22709255) filed by Rita Schaab. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 county court docket sheet, #3 county court citation, #4 plaintiffs' original petition, #5 defendant's original answer, #6 index of matters being filed)(Tijerina, Guillermo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales et al v. Schaab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jovita Gonzales
Represented By: Robert Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Gonzales
Represented By: Robert Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Schaab
Represented By: Guillermo Tijerina, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?