Garcia v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust et al
Plaintiff: Raul N Garcia
Defendant: Substitute Trustee David R. Karle, Caliber Home Loans and U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Case Number: 7:2019cv00235
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Randy Crane
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Caliber Home Loans, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Beverly, Lauren)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Initial Conference reset for 10/9/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Randy Crane)(Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
August 26, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE by Caliber Home Loans, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone)(Beverly, Lauren)
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Caliber Home Loans, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, filed.(Beverly, Lauren)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion for Continuance (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified. (NelidaLosoya, 7)
August 14, 2019 ***Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Randy Crane (klopez, 7)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Continuance by Caliber Home Loans, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Continuance)(Beverly, Lauren)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Case terminated on 08/02/2019 (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Substitute Trustee David R. Karle, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Danaher, Philip)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Defendants U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust and Caliber Home Loans, Inc.'s #8 MOTION for Philip W. Danaher to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION to Substitute Attorney Lauren N. Beverly, Attorney Jeremy Jason Overbey, Lauren N Beverly for Caliber Home Loans, Jeremy Jason Overbey, Lauren N Beverly for U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust added Attorney Mark Douglas Cronenwett and Philip W Danaher terminated (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Philip W. Danaher to Withdraw as Attorney( Motion Docket Date 8/20/2019.), MOTION to Substitute Attorney Lauren N. Beverly by Caliber Home Loans, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Beverly, Lauren)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Caliber Home Loans, Substitute Trustee David R. Karle, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, filed.(Danaher, Philip)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Raul N Garcia, filed.(Guerra, Juan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Raul N Garcia, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order order)(Guerra, Juan).
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(6), by Caliber Home Loans, Substitute Trustee David R. Karle, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Danaher, Philip).
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Randy Crane(by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Caliber Home Loans, Substitute Trustee David R. Karle, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In County Court at Law Number 5 Hidalgo County, Texas, case number CL-19-3511-E (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22775910) filed by Substitute Trustee David R. Karle, Caliber Home Loans, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Substitute Trustee David R. Karle
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Represented By: Philip W Danaher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Represented By: Philip W Danaher
Represented By: Jeremy Jason Overbey
Represented By: Lauren N Beverly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., As Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Represented By: Philip W Danaher
Represented By: Jeremy Jason Overbey
Represented By: Lauren N Beverly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul N Garcia
Represented By: Juan Angel Guerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?