Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc. v. F & T FARMS & CATTLE CO. et al
Plaintiff: Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc.
Defendant: FAUSTO SALINAS JR. and F & T FARMS & CATTLE CO.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00238
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re: #10 Motion for Leave to Appear (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified. (NelidaLosoya, 7)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by F & T FARMS & CATTLE CO., FAUSTO SALINAS JR., filed.(Hernandez, Jose)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Gregory Dimmick to Appear as Attorney by Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stephens, Sarah)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc., filed.(Stephens, Sarah)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by F & T FARMS & CATTLE CO., filed.(Hernandez, Jose)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FAUSTO SALINAS JR., filed.(Hernandez, Jose)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to FAUSTO SALINAS JR. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019, filed.(Dimmick, Gregory)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to F & T FARMS & CATTLE CO. served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/14/2019, filed.(Dimmick, Gregory) Modified on 7/31/2019 (klopez, 7).
July 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons)(Dimmick, Gregory)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc., filed.(Dimmick, Gregory)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-22796041) filed by Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dimmick, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc. v. F & T FARMS & CATTLE CO. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAUSTO SALINAS JR.
Represented By: Jose Wilfredo Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F & T FARMS & CATTLE CO.
Represented By: Jose Wilfredo Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory Howell Dimmick
Represented By: John Mark Stephens
Represented By: Sarah Lynne Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?