United States of America v. Gonzalez
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Juan H. Gonzalez
Case Number: 7:2019cv00267
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ricardo H Hinojosa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 20:1080
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry Agreed Judgment by United States of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed Judgment)(Cersonsky, M)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 10/17/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa (previously set for 10/9/2019), filed. (adelagarza, 7)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 10/17/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa (previously set for 10/9/2019), filed. (adelagarza, 7)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Juan H. Gonzalez served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019, filed.(Cersonsky, M)
August 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to Juan H. Gonzalez. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff in person, filed.(jdav, 4)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by United States of America, filed.(Cersonsky, M)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Student Loan) against Juan H. Gonzalez filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cersonsky, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan H. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: M H Cersonsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?