J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. El Vaquero's Hangout, LLC et al
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: El Vaquero's Hangout, LLC and Edna Farias
Case Number: 7:2019cv00329
Filed: September 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ricardo H Hinojosa
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 FINAL JUDGMENT. Case terminated on 11/12/2019 (Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Order re: Entry of Agreed Judgment by J&J Sports Productions, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 proposed Agreed Judgment)(Diaz, David)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Edna Farias. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(klopez, 7)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to El Vaquero's Hangout, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(klopez, 7)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Edna Farias, filed.(Diaz, David)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to El Vaquero's Hangout, LLC, filed.(Diaz, David)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/14/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
September 15, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by J&J Sports Productions, Inc., filed.(Diaz, David)
September 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23178771) filed by J&J Sports Productions, Inc..(Diaz, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. El Vaquero's Hangout, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Vaquero's Hangout, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edna Farias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?