Martinez v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Luis Enrique Martinez
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 7:2019cv00343
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER. ( Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2020, Pltf Expert Report due by 5/22/2020, Deft Expert Report due by 7/3/2020, Discovery due by 10/2/2020, Dispositive Motion Filing due by 10/16/2020, Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/18/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 1/18/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez) Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conferences of 11/13/2019 CANCELED. (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(XavierAvalos, 7)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by FCA US LLC, filed.(Kern, Kurt)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Luis Enrique Martinez, filed.(Garcia, Ramon)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FCA US LLC identifying FCA North America Holdings LLC as Corporate Parent, filed.(Kern, Kurt)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by FCA US LLC, filed.(Kern, Kurt)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Crawford-Steger on behalf of FCA US LLC, filed. (Kern, Kurt)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Yesenia E. Cardenas-Colenso on behalf of FCA US LLC, filed. (Kern, Kurt)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(NelidaLosoya, 7)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 93rd District Court, Hidalgo County, TX, case number C369919B (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23274035) filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kern, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Enrique Martinez
Represented By: Ramon Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Kurt C Kern
Represented By: Amanda Crawford-Steger
Represented By: Yesenia Esmeralda Cardenas-Colenso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?