IOU Central, Inc.d/b/a IOU Financial, Inc. v. Loeras Fresh Produce, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: IOU CENTRAL, INC. d/b/a IOU FINANCIAL, INC. and IOU Central, Inc.
Defendant: FLOR ESTELA ANES, Lone Star National Bank, N.A., ROLANDO MENDOZA LOERA and LOERAS FRESH PRODUCE, INC.
Case Number: 7:2019cv00406
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Randy Crane
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE ENTRY (Plaintiff has 10 days to respond) (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/8/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Randy Crane(by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa recused. Case reassigned to Judge Randy Crane for all further proceedings, Deadlines terminated(Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and 12(b)(1) by Lone Star National Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 1/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nixon, Weldon)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Mendoza, #2 Anes, #3 Lone Star)(klopez, 7)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa (by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons Rolando, #2 Supplement Summons Anes, #3 Supplement Lone Star)(Wersant, Paul)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23717123) filed by IOU CENTRAL, INC. d/b/a IOU FINANCIAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wersant, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IOU Central, Inc.d/b/a IOU Financial, Inc. v. Loeras Fresh Produce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOR ESTELA ANES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Star National Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Weldon G Nixon, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROLANDO MENDOZA LOERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOERAS FRESH PRODUCE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IOU CENTRAL, INC. d/b/a IOU FINANCIAL, INC.
Represented By: Paul Gerard Wersant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IOU Central, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Gerard Wersant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?