UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $210,100.00 U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $210,100.00 U.S. Currency
Case Number: 7:2020cv00052
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 0981
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Joint MOTION to Stay Civil Proceedings. (Status Report due by 7/10/2020) (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Stay Civil Proceedings by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Muschenheim, Jon)
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 First CLAIM Interest in Defendant Cash/Oppose Forfeiture filed by $210,100.00 U.S. Currency.(Rivera, Ismael)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by $210,100.00 U.S. Currency, filed.(Rivera, Ismael)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for ORder Directing Clerk to Issue a Warrant of Arrest in REM by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to Issue Arrest Warrant in Rem, #2 Unredacted attachment Warrant of Arrest in REM)(Muschenheim, Jon)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed.(Muschenheim, Jon)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $210,100.00 U.S. Currency filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Muschenheim, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $210,100.00 U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $210,100.00 U.S. Currency
Represented By: Ismael Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Jon Muschenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?