Reyes et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tomas Reyes and Claudia Reyes
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vacsular, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2020cv00285
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ricardo H Hinojosa
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bard Peripheral Vacsular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., filed.(Agnew, Kristin)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Claudia Reyes, Tomas Reyes, filed.(Silhan, Caitlyn)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Bard Peripheral Vacsular, Inc. served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020, filed.(Silhan, Caitlyn)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to C.R. Bard, Inc. served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020, filed.(Silhan, Caitlyn)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(klopez, 7)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/15/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa (by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Bard Peripheral Vacsular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Silhan, Caitlyn)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bard Peripheral Vacsular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25229010) filed by Claudia Reyes, Tomas Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Silhan, Caitlyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reyes et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Reyes
Represented By: Caitlyn Elizabeth Silhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Reyes
Represented By: Caitlyn Elizabeth Silhan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Brown Kerlin
Represented By: Kristin Harshaw Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vacsular, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Brown Kerlin
Represented By: Kristin Harshaw Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?