American Savings Life Insurance Company v. Audie E. Ray Real Estate Lending, Inc.
Plaintiff: American Savings Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Audie E. Ray Real Estate Lending, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2021cv00320
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Randy Crane
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF AMERICAN SAVINGS LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S DISCLOSURE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by American Savings Life Insurance Company, filed.(Parrish, Ashley)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME granting #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to answer Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. Defendant shall have until October 24, 2021 to answer. (Signed by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(SandraSilva, 7)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to answer Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by American Savings Life Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Entry)(Parrish, Ashley)
September 23, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Audie E. Ray Real Estate Lending, Inc. served on 9/22/2021, answer due 10/13/2021, filed.(Parrish, Ashley)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 Civil Cover Sheet by American Savings Life Insurance Company, filed.(Parrish, Ashley)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Audie E. Ray Real Estate Lending, Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/3/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Randy Crane(by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Audie E. Ray Real Estate Lending, Inc., filed.(Parrish, Ashley)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Audie E. Ray Real Estate Lending, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26949319) filed by American Savings Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Parrish, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Savings Life Insurance Company v. Audie E. Ray Real Estate Lending, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Savings Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Ashley T Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audie E. Ray Real Estate Lending, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?