G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Reign Nightclub, LLC et al
Plaintiff: G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Defendant: Reign Nightclub, LLC doing business as Reign Nightclub doing business as Reign Night Club and Ernesto Guajardo doing business as Reign Nightclub doing business as Reign Night Club
Case Number: 7:2021cv00342
Filed: September 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Randy Crane
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Ernesto Guajardo, filed.(Palacios, Juan)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(klopez, 7)
September 16, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request for Ernesto Guajardo)(Diaz, David)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/8/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Randy Crane(by Judge Randy Crane) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7)
September 14, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC, filed.(Diaz, David)
September 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27043565) filed by G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC.(Diaz, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Reign Nightclub, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Represented By: David M. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reign Nightclub, LLC doing business as Reign Nightclub doing business as Reign Night Club
Represented By: Juan Sonny Palacios, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernesto Guajardo doing business as Reign Nightclub doing business as Reign Night Club
Represented By: Juan Sonny Palacios, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?