Doctors Hospital at Renaissance, LTD. v. Employers Insurance Company of Wausau et al
Plaintiff: Doctors Hospital at Renaissance, LTD.
Defendant: Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Christopher Alvarez, GSM Insurors and Jim Hansen
Case Number: 7:2021cv00418
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Micaela Alvarez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition to #8 Opposed MOTION to Remand, filed by Christopher Alvarez, Employers Insurance Company of Wausau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(O'Malley, Shannon)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPLY in Support of #3 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Christopher Alvarez, Employers Insurance Company of Wausau. (O'Malley, Shannon)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (Initial Conference reset for 2/11/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez), (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Christopher Alvarez, Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, filed.(O'Malley, Shannon)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition to #3 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Doctors Hospital at Renaissance, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cox, Gregory)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Opposed MOTION to Remand by Doctors Hospital at Renaissance, LTD., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cox, Gregory)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, filed.(O'Malley, Shannon)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Doctors Hospital at Renaissance, LTD., filed.(Cox, Gregory)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by GSM Insurors, Jim Hansen, filed.(Long, Kevin)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, filed.(O'Malley, Shannon)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Christopher Alvarez, Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Moss, Bennett)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/14/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(SandraSilva, 7)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 139th Judicial Court Hidalgo County, case number C-3951-21-C (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27275822) filed by Christopher Alvarez, Employers Insurance Company of Wausau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moss, Bennett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doctors Hospital at Renaissance, LTD. v. Employers Insurance Company of Wausau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doctors Hospital at Renaissance, LTD.
Represented By: Gregory F Cox
Represented By: Cathryn Jaime Schexnaider
Represented By: Juan Mendez, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Insurance Company of Wausau
Represented By: Bennett A Moss
Represented By: Shannon Marie O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Alvarez
Represented By: Shannon Marie O'Malley
Represented By: Bennett A Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSM Insurors
Represented By: Rick Lee Oldenettel
Represented By: Kevin Michael Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Hansen
Represented By: Rick Lee Oldenettel
Represented By: Kevin Michael Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?