Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Buffalos Wing Pub, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Buffalos Wing Pub, LLC d/b/a Buffalos Wing Pub and Juan Angel Garcia Elizondo
Case Number: 7:2021cv00466
Filed: December 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ricardo H Hinojosa
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., filed.(King, Jamie)
January 6, 2022 Case terminated on 01/06/2022. (by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7)
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., filed.(King, Jamie)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons.( Initial Conference set for 3/9/2022 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa). (Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7)
December 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Jamie)
December 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(klopez, 7)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/9/2022 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa (by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(klopez, 7)
December 6, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(King, Jamie)
December 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27435949) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Buffalos Wing Pub, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buffalos Wing Pub, LLC d/b/a Buffalos Wing Pub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Angel Garcia Elizondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?