Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media v. E&Y LLC et al
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media
Defendant: E&Y LLC d/b/a Oak Texas Bar and Jorge Eduardo Guajardo
Case Number: 7:2021cv00467
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ricardo H Hinojosa
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Filing 10 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by E&Y LLC, filed.(Flores, Robert)
February 2, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jorge Eduardo Guajardo, filed.(Flores, Robert)
January 24, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by E&Y LLC, filed.(Flores, Robert)
December 14, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media, filed.(King, Jamie)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/9/2022 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7)
December 9, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(King, Jamie)
December 7, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to E&Y LLC and Jorge Eduardo Guajardo. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(kanelson, 7)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/10/2022 at 02:30 PM before Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa(Signed by Judge Ricardo H Hinojosa) Parties notified.(kanelson, 7)
December 7, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(King, Jamie)
December 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27441388) filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media v. E&Y LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media
Represented By: Jamie Renee King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E&Y LLC d/b/a Oak Texas Bar
Represented By: Robert Ray Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Eduardo Guajardo
Represented By: Robert Ray Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?