Hamilton et al v. Koppers Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ernest Hanks, Patrick ONeal Jackson, Chester Jackson, Joseph Harris, Jr., Ollie Holmes, Jr., Brent Heath, Anisha Hemphill, Dominique Y. Hogues, Barbara J. Hester, Donna D. Jackson, Marilyn Jackson, Keisha Ann Jackson, Deandrea Jackson, Junasia Dynette Jackson, Rickye Lee Harrison, Shannon My'Lisa Harris, Karusha Jafrika Ynesha Hogues, Diamonte Deshaun Jackson, Barbara Hawkins Hutson, Meshell Annette Jackson, Andre Isom, Sylvia Hickman, Fredrick ONeal Jackson, Beverly Ann Jackson, Theordore Jackson, Joh L. Isom, Eddie M. Hamilton, Ronald G. Hester, Minnie J. Jackson, Kelton Hemphill, Justin J. Hemphill, Calvin Lee Harrison, Sr., Robert Jackson, Jalen Hemphill, Brandon S. Hemphill, Mederrle D. Hamilton, Dora J. Holiday, Victoria Hemphill, James Henderson, Johnnie Mae Hester, Calvin Lee Harrison, Jr., Debbie Hornsby Gibbs, Rickey Gene Jackson, Kordero J. Harris, Evelyn E. Hill, Donald W. Isom, Jesse Vasquez Hogues, Jr., Pearl Jackson, Douglasia Deray Jackson, Lois M. Harris, Jamialyn Harris, Joshua Hemphill, Eugenie Y. Harris, Christopher Earl Jackson, Brodrick Jackson, Sharon Heath, Vania Hornsby, Goree Hawkins, Nathan E. Harris, Charlie Mae Hicks, Ronald Hudson, Deborah Hemphill, Alberta W. Hanks, Margie Heath, Steven Hawkins, Douglas D. Jackson, William Jackson, Elizabeth Harris, James E. Harris, Jr., Deonte Rayshaun Jackson, Chester Jackson, Jr., Patricia Harris, Crystal S. Hemphill, Rodney Hawkins, Austina Jackson, Richard Hawkins, Krystal Harris, Marion Roberson Hogues and Maxine B. Hamilton
Defendant: Koppers Industries, Inc. and Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company
Consolidated Plaintiff: Margaret Pennie, Frank Quiniero, William J. Manas, Jr., Maxine Lockett, Demetrius L. Ellis, James McDonald, Shanetra Michelle Davis, Euralene Moore, Hillary Plumber, Hilario Martinez, Jr., Jonathan Dewayne Moore, Kilroy Fisher, Robert A. Baxter, Ollie H. Nix, Audresha Spates, Dwayne M.A. Ellis, Michael Keshawn Scarlett, Deloise M. Wise, Anthony Moore, James E. Turner, Edward M. Rogers, Quantaruis Eugene Devault, Roman B. Moore, Jr., Dalia Vela, Vickie Plumber, Gerry B. Moore, Rickie L. Knox, Miranda Moore, Robin L. Coleman, Jr., Derrick K. Stringfellow, Clidy Mae Williams, Ernesto Espinoza, Jermy Johnson, Tarrance Price, Teresa A. Johnson, Donna Ray, Annie Lee Lockett, Wright C. Ratliff, Rodessa Grays, Lonnie Ray Johnson, Rufus Lockett, Michael Parker, Precious Burns, Willie Wiley, Duwonn Evans, David Williams, Donnie H. Coleman, Venessa R. Bryant, Courtney Parker, William J. Manas, III, Lalonda Burns, William Louis Carey, Sherry Ragston, Ruby J. Williams, Nathan Rogers, Mary Ann Gonzales, A. D. Roberson, Rhonda Thomas, Claudis Thurman, Sr., Daisy Mae Scarlett, Lester S. Moore, Ester Ellis, Marcus T. Mathis, Detrenia Burns, Henry Burns, Michelle Ratliff, Manuel Mejias, Darryl Ellis, Barbara Brooks, Morris Ray, Shangelia Moore Lewis Kendall, Leonard Watson, Edna Moore, Melvia H. Powell, Ashley Batts, Mike C. Vela, Johonn McGowan, Sr., Chadrick Moore, Tommie Lee Burns, Kenneth W. Porter, Richard Moore, Jr., Royce Dorsey, Porsha Batts, Rekeida A. Garner, Susie Townsend, Jateria Turner, Vester Thomas, Carolyn Fleming Franklin, Terry Lynn Burns, Ja'Quentin Powell, Harlan C. Plumber, Jahla Johnson, Johnnie B. Williams, Richard L. Brooks, Paul Johnson, Dataya Cummings, Kiasha Roberts, Jonnisha Cooper, Christopher S. Moore, Erica M. Moore, John M. Vela, Henry W. Aldridge, Shanetra Stevenson, Michael Tealer, Louise Cromo, Robert P. Feltus, Daisy L. Gentry, Norris Davis, Alma Roberson, Richard Duran, Gerald Wayne Roberts, Sheila Moore, Clarence Grays, Danita Michelle Ellis, Sabrina Gordon, Casie J. Moore, Linda C. Adams, Anthony Ray, Telisha Wiseman, Latreas Manas, Latanya Fisher, Quneisha Roberts, Patrice Pleasant, Jessie Lee Johnson, Jr., Jessica Johnson, Bryant O. Gentry, Anquinsha Cummings, Marcus Nickerson, Lasharde Hall, Vivian Watson, Alvita C. Arrington, Kaylor L. Brown, Mable Davis, Broderick Batts, Eric Wilson, Zoccorro Schicle, Derrick Diggs, Joystene C. Moore, Clara Lister, James Townsend, J. D. Turner, Jasmine Moses, Katie M. Davis, Charles Polite, Eclisha Davis, Christopher Michael Spates, Darryl G. Ellis, Clifton Burns, III, Charles Townsend, Clifton J. Burns, Sr., Jastazzia Goffinet, Tracy Cole, Melissa Mejias, Otis Roberts, Jr., Brittany Nicole Burnett, Linda K. Burns, Barbie D. Carter, Sandra P. Bass, Minnie Burns, Craig Leon Mathis, Patricia Ann Gonzales, Rosalyn V. Spencer, Chelsea Mitchell, Princess E. Fisher, Katherine Feltus, Inez Davis, Jesica McClain, Florence Gentry Wilson, Tommie Lee Burns, Sr., Mary E. Watson, Ursala N. McCarty, Arthur D. Kennerson, Mattie J. Carey, John E. Cooper, Lisa Ann Nickerson, Dorothy Washington, Krishna McGowan, Floyd W. Bradley, Richard Moore, Sr., Kevin Dewayne Ford, Ella Mae Johnson, Roscoe McGregor, Jr., Brala D. Swain, Brenda Nicks, J.C. Johnson, Linda Givens Lauderdale, Benice Guyton, Patrick Pleasant, Sr., Cornola Moore, Bessie M. Spencer, Ina Cross, Helen Freeman, Donna Ruth Johnson, Etta J. Williams, Onie Mae Turner, Douglas Ray Burns, Everlene Reliford, Lacreshia Reliford, Johnell Johnson, Robert D. Bell, Sr., William O. Feltus, Laquitta G. Lister, Nicole Batts, Brittany Leann Fisher, Dorothy Mathis, Richard Gonzalez, Barbarett Stevenson, Billy Hagan, Eureka S. Rhodes, Nikita Ray, Gloria Burns, Romeo W. Moore, Georgia Spencer, Ora Lee Price, Kei Amber More, Michael Smith, Douglas N. Moore, Alton A. Sweeney, Jr., Joseph Perez, Treas Moore Manas, Michelle Mejias Arguello, Raveen Moore, Jaborie Rucks, Cassandra Coleman, Rhoda Lee Hall, Diandrea L. Ellis, James Simpson, James Roy Fisher, Stacie Woodberry, Barbara McDonald, Terrance Young, Bobby Ray Pennie, Milton E. McNeil, Sr., Leon D. Brinston, Terry Davis, Tyson Wilson, Herbert C. Plumber, Jr., Basel L. Lister, Florence Gentry, David Ellis, Deonte Hagan, Rajanae Scyres, Versie Davis, Debra Coleman, Deborah Schicle, Marcus Martinez, Qurisha Scarlett, Michele Stifflemire, William Carey, Lashanda Batts, Shirley L. Gentry, Beverly Pleasant, Mary Woodfork Williams, Sandra Lee Lister, Latomia Batts, Jessie L. Burns, Latasha Moore, Irene F. Galloway, Patrick Pleasant, Jr., Rebecca Mathis, Rarterrius Schicle, Brandon E. Fisher, Raymond Lockett, Jr., Donnell Barrett, Danita C. Kyles, Nicraisha Lyon Mathis, Santoya Copeland, Jasmine Batts, Robert Lee Moore, Tevin Jamal Johnson, Shawn Micahel Johnson, Jo Ann Greene, Cynthia Washington, Jabari Johnson, Lakeisha Pleasant, Tanette L. Roberts, Lillie M. Gentry, Jaycee Young, Corey C. Jeffery, Wallace Taylor, Valencia Davis, Loretta D. Ellis, Brandon T. Adams, Roeshon Reliford, Jamar Johnson, Prentiss George Phillips, Oliver Phillips, Clarice Devault, Winiford Parker, Allen Fisher, Anthony V. Watson, Bessie M. Ratliff, Anthony Antoine Brown, Wiley Brooks, Heather Ratliff, Ola Mae Davis, Ella Dorsey, Johnnie P. Underwood, Mary Moses, Debra J. Rhodes, Calanthia Brooks, William H. Washington, Lyvonne S. Frank, Ray Roberson, Robert A. Moore, Sr., Clifton J. Burns, Jr., Kenneth Wayne Lauderdale, Derrick Coleman, Brian Rachad Nicks, Annie L. Davis, Sedrick M. Bradley, Shala Davis, Willie Mae Moore, Melvin Copeland, Charlie James Moore, Jennifer Marie Johnson, Roman Moore, Ca'ron Wilson, Justin L. Aldridge, Mickle Burns, Josephine Singleton, Damion L. Brooks, Nicole Shuntae Russell, Julius Miller, Donnyelle Burns, Anthony G. Wilson, Courtney D. Telsede, Jonas Woodfork, Lurise Page, Roscoe McGregor, Sr., Kenneth P. Nix, Dorothy Jean Thurmon, Don Boyce, Nikkia J. Burns Matete, Zephyr R. Cooper, Sandra Batts, James C. Burns, Doris Jean Green, Paula K. Walker, Robinisha Feltus, Darline Burns, Paula S. Phillips, Gloria Townsend, Joel Fisher, Stephanie Garfield, Lee Edward Eldridge, Billy Gene Wiley, Mildred Roberson, Melonie Nickerson, Minnie Wilson, Lois M. Brooks-Nix, Calvin M. Bradley, Herbert Spencer, Wright Ratliff, Jr., Freddie Williams, Shawn McNeil and Donnell Deveon Jenkins
Case Number: 1:2008cv00129
Filed: February 25, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
County: Burleson
Presiding Judge: Sam Sparks
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2008. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2008 Filing 64 Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE Dismissing #59 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory, filed by Calvin Lee Harrison, Jr., Brodrick Jackson, Fredrick ONeal Jackson, Steven Hawkins, Ronald G. Hester, Diamonte Deshaun Jackson, Evelyn E. Hill, Justin J. Hemphill, Douglasia Deray Jackson, Beverly Ann Jackson, Debbie Hornsby Gibbs, Rodney Hawkins, Junasia Dynette Jackson, James Henderson, Shannon My'Lisa Harris, Donald W. Isom, Calvin Lee Harrison, Sr., Rickey Gene Jackson, Deborah Hemphill, Marion Roberson Hogues, Brent Heath, Jalen Hemphill, Victoria Hemphill, Sharon Heath, Ollie Holmes, Jr., Lois M. Harris, Elizabeth Harris, Chester Jackson, Eddie M. Hamilton, Sylvia Hickman, Rodrick ONeal Jackson, Alberta W. Hanks, Johnnie Mae Hester, Minnie R. Jackson, Minnie J. Jackson, Chester Jackson, Jr., Joshua Hemphill, Joseph Harris, Jr., Mosevelt Jackson, Sr., Deandrea Jackson, Robert Jackson, Brandon S. Hemphill, Kordero J. Harris, Shantel R. Hamilton, Ernest Hanks, Crystal S. Hemphill, Andre Isom, Anisha Hemphill, Rica Hemphill, Ronald Hudson, James E. Harris, Jr., Nathan E. Harris, Donna D. Jackson, Ronald Isom, Xavion Hemphill, Travis Harris, Jr., Deonte Rayshaun Jackson, Karusha Jafrika Ynesha Hogues, Mederrle D. Hamilton, Dora J. Holiday, Theordore Jackson, Richard Hawkins, Kelton Hemphill, James E. Harris, Andrea Jackson, Ray Gene Jackson, Jesse Vasquez Hogues, Jr., Jamialyn Harris, Joh L. Isom, William Jackson, Vania Hornsby, Marlon Hudson, Chandra J. Harris, Charlie Mae Hicks, Barbara J. Hester, Patricia Harris, Goree Hawkins, Barbara Hawkins Hutson, Christopher Earl Jackson, Rickye Lee Harrison, Austina Jackson, Marilyn Jackson, Pearl Jackson, Eugenie Y. Harris, Dominique Y. Hogues, Maxine B. Hamilton, Keisha Ann Jackson, Douglas D. Jackson, Alexandria Hemphill, Patrick ONeal Jackson, Meshell Annette Jackson, Margie Heath, Krystal Harris. (jk, )
October 28, 2008 Filing 62 USCA Appeal Info Sheet received. USCA Case Number 08-51068 for #59 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory,,,,,,,, filed by Calvin Lee Harrison, Jr., Brodrick Jackson, Fredrick ONeal Jackson, Steven Hawkins, Ronald G. Hester, Diamonte Deshaun Jackson, Evelyn E. Hill, Justin J. Hemphill, Douglasia Deray Jackson, Beverly Ann Jackson, Debbie Hornsby Gibbs, Rodney Hawkins, Junasia Dynette Jackson, James Henderson, Shannon My'Lisa Harris, Donald W. Isom, Calvin Lee Harrison, Sr., Rickey Gene Jackson, Deborah Hemphill, Marion Roberson Hogues, Brent Heath, Jalen Hemphill, Victoria Hemphill, Sharon Heath, Ollie Holmes, Jr., Lois M. Harris, Elizabeth Harris, Chester Jackson, Eddie M. Hamilton, Sylvia Hickman, Rodrick ONeal Jackson, Alberta W. Hanks, Johnnie Mae Hester, Minnie R. Jackson, Minnie J. Jackson, Chester Jackson, Jr., Joshua Hemphill, Joseph Harris, Jr., Mosevelt Jackson, Sr., Deandrea Jackson, Robert Jackson, Brandon S. Hemphill, Kordero J. Harris, Shantel R. Hamilton, Ernest Hanks, Crystal S. Hemphill, Andre Isom, Anisha Hemphill, Rica Hemphill, Ronald Hudson, James E. Harris, Jr., Nathan E. Harris, Donna D. Jackson, Ronald Isom, Xavion Hemphill, Travis Harris, Jr., Deonte Rayshaun Jackson, Karusha Jafrika Ynesha Hogues, Mederrle D. Hamilton, Dora J. Holiday, Theordore Jackson, Richard Hawkins, Kelton Hemphill, James E. Harris, Andrea Jackson, Ray Gene Jackson, Jesse Vasquez Hogues, Jr., Jamialyn Harris, Joh L. Isom, William Jackson, Vania Hornsby, Marlon Hudson, Chandra J. Harris, Charlie Mae Hicks, Barbara J. Hester, Patricia Harris, Goree Hawkins, Barbara Hawkins Hutson, Christopher Earl Jackson, Rickye Lee Harrison, Austina Jackson, Marilyn Jackson, Pearl Jackson, Eugenie Y. Harris, Dominique Y. Hogues, Maxine B. Hamilton, Keisha Ann Jackson, Douglas D. Jackson, Alexandria Hemphill, Patrick ONeal Jackson, Meshell Annette Jackson, Margie Heath, Krystal Harris. (mh, )
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk, )
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DISMISSING #56 Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal; DENYING #60 Motion for Reconsideration; CONSOLIDATING cause numbers 08-cv-129, 08-cv-130, 08-cv-131, 08-cv-132, 08-cv-133, 08-cv-134 under lead case 08-cv-129; DISMISSING consolidated cases for failure to sever claims. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk, )
October 21, 2008 Filing 60 * MOTION for Reconsideration re #50 Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion to Sever,, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,,, From Order by Eddie M. Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hankins, Grover)
October 7, 2008 Filing 59 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #54 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, #50 Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion to Sever,, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,,,, by James E. Harris, James E. Harris, Jr, Jamialyn Harris, Joseph Harris, Jr, Kordero J. Harris, Krystal Harris, Lois M. Harris, Nathan E. Harris, Patricia Harris, Shannon My'Lisa Harris, Eddie M. Hamilton, Travis Harris, Jr, Calvin Lee Harrison, Jr, Calvin Lee Harrison, Sr, Rickye Lee Harrison, Goree Hawkins, Richard Hawkins, Rodney Hawkins, Steven Hawkins, Brent Heath, Maxine B. Hamilton, Margie Heath, Sharon Heath, Alexandria Hemphill, Anisha Hemphill, Brandon S. Hemphill, Crystal S. Hemphill, Deborah Hemphill, Jalen Hemphill, Joshua Hemphill, Justin J. Hemphill, Mederrle D. Hamilton, Kelton Hemphill, Rica Hemphill, Victoria Hemphill, Xavion Hemphill, James Henderson, Barbara J. Hester, Johnnie Mae Hester, Ronald G. Hester, Sylvia Hickman, Charlie Mae Hicks, Shantel R. Hamilton, Evelyn E. Hill, Dominique Y. Hogues, Jesse Vasquez Hogues, Jr, Karusha Jafrika Ynesha Hogues, Marion Roberson Hogues, Dora J. Holiday, Ollie Holmes, Jr, Debbie Hornsby Gibbs, Vania Hornsby, Marlon Hudson, Alberta W. Hanks, Ronald Hudson, Barbara Hawkins Hutson, Andre Isom, Donald W. Isom, Joh L. Isom, Ronald Isom, Austina Jackson, Andrea Jackson, Beverly Ann Jackson, Brodrick Jackson, Ernest Hanks, Chester Jackson, Chester Jackson, Jr, Christopher Earl Jackson, Deandrea Jackson, Deonte Rayshaun Jackson, Diamonte Deshaun Jackson, Donna D. Jackson, Douglas D. Jackson, Douglasia Deray Jackson, Fredrick ONeal Jackson, Chandra J. Harris, Junasia Dynette Jackson, Keisha Ann Jackson, Marilyn Jackson, Meshell Annette Jackson, Minnie J. Jackson, Minnie R. Jackson, Mosevelt Jackson, Sr, Patrick ONeal Jackson, Pearl Jackson, Ray Gene Jackson, Elizabeth Harris, Rickey Gene Jackson, Robert Jackson, Rodrick ONeal Jackson, Theordore Jackson, William Jackson, Eugenie Y. Harris. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0100-00429479. (mh, )
October 7, 2008 Filing 58 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Koppers Industries, Inc., Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company, re #56 * MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal filed by Plaintiff Eddie M. Hamilton (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burnett, Susan)
October 7, 2008 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eddie M. Hamilton #56 * MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal (Hankins, Grover)
October 6, 2008 Filing 56 * MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Appeal by Eddie M. Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Appeal, #2 Proposed Order)(Hankins, Grover)
September 4, 2008 Filing 55 NOTICE of Transfer of Related Case by Koppers Industries, Inc., Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Burnett, Susan)
August 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING #51 Motion for Extension of Time to File; DENYING Motion to Clarify Court's Order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk, )
August 26, 2008 Filing 53 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #52 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Koppers Industries, Inc., Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company. (Freeborn, Paul)
August 26, 2008 Filing 52 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Koppers Industries, Inc., Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company, re #51 *Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Motion to Clarify Court's Order filed by Plaintiff Eddie M. Hamilton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Freeborn, Paul)
August 15, 2008 Filing 51 *Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File and Motion to Clarify Court's Order by Eddie M. Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hankins, Grover)
August 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Sever; DENYING #17 Motion to Remand to State Court; DISMISSING AS MOOT #12 Motion to Strike ; DISMISSING AS MOOT #39 Motion for Leave to File; DISMISSING AS MOOT #40 Motion for Leave to File; DISMISSING AS MOOT #48 Motion for Leave to File; DISMISSING AS MOOT #49 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk, )
August 8, 2008 Filing 49 *Joint MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Subsequent Authority by Koppers Industries, Inc., Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Joint Notice of Subsequent Authority, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Joint Motion for Leave to File Notice of Subsequent Authority)(Burnett, Susan)
June 27, 2008 Filing 48 *Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Letter Brief in Response to Plaintiffs' New Argument Regarding the Amount in Controversy by Koppers Industries, Inc., Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Letter Brief, #2 Proposed Order)(Burnett, Susan) Modified docket text on 6/27/2008 (jk, ).
June 23, 2008 Filing 47 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on June 13, 2008, Proceedings Transcribed: All Pending Motions/Status Conference. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: (512)916-5564. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 7/14/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2008. (Reznik, Lily)
June 20, 2008 Filing 46 BRIEF by Koppers Industries, Inc., Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company Letter Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Letter Brief)(Burnett, Susan)
June 20, 2008 Filing 45 SUPPLEMENT Letter Brief by Eddie M. Hamilton. (Hankins, Grover)
June 13, 2008 Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Status/Pending Motions Conference held on 6/13/2008 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(dm, )
June 11, 2008 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Michael Wills, III; Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 428062. (jk, )
June 11, 2008 Filing 43 ATTACHMENT Order to #40 *Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #41 Deficiency Notice, #42 Deficiency Notice, #39 *Opposed MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND by Eddie M. Hamilton. (Hankins, Grover)
June 11, 2008 Filing 42 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #40 *Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #39 *Opposed MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND (mc2, )
June 11, 2008 Filing 41 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #40 *Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #39 *Opposed MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND (mc2, )
June 10, 2008 Filing 40 *Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by Eddie M. Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand)(Hankins, Grover)
June 10, 2008 Filing 39 *Opposed MOTION for Leave to File PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' JOINT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND by Eddie M. Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hankins, Grover)
May 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Michael Wills, III). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk, )
May 28, 2008 Filing 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Grover G. Hankins by on behalf of Eddie M. Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hankins, Grover)
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #35 MOTION to Continue May 27, 2008 Status Conference and Hearing in all Pending Motions filed by Koppers Industries, Inc., ( Status Conference set for 6/13/2008 02:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks.), ( Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2008 02:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks re: #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #15 Joint MOTION to Sever Pursuant to the Court's October 12, 2006 Order and Fed. R. Civ. P. 21, #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of Plaintiff's' Motion to Remand, #12 MOTION to Strike). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk, )
May 20, 2008 Filing 35 MOTION to Continue May 27, 2008 Status Conference and Hearing in all Pending Motions by Koppers Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Verification)(Burnett, Susan)
May 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER, ( Status Conference set for 5/27/2008 02:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks,) ( Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2008 02:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks re: #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court, #15 Joint MOTION to Sever Pursuant to the Court's October 12, 2006 Order and Fed. R. Civ. P. 21, #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of Plaintiff's' Motion to Remand, #12 MOTION to Strike ). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk, )
May 12, 2008 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Defendants' Notice of Subsequent Authority by Eddie M. Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bullard Order)(Hankins, Grover)
April 28, 2008 Filing 32 NOTICE of Subsequent Authority by Koppers Industries, Inc., Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company re #28 Response to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Burnett, Susan)
April 14, 2008 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eddie M. Hamilton #30 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendants' Joint Motion to Sever Pursuant to the Court's October 12, 2006 Order and Fed.R.Civ.P.21 Out of Time (Hankins, Grover)
April 11, 2008 Filing 30 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendants' Joint Motion to Sever Pursuant to the Court's October 12, 2006 Order and Fed.R.Civ.P.21 Out of Time by Eddie M. Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Joint Motion to Sever Pursuant to the Court's October 12, 2006 Order and Fed.R.Civ.P.21, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Response to Defendants' Joint Motion to Sever Pursuant to the Court's October 12, 2006 Order and Fed.R.Civ.P.21 Out of Time)(Hankins, Grover)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk, )
April 9, 2008 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Koppers Industries, Inc., Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company, re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Eddie M. Hamilton (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Proposed Order)(Burnett, Susan)
April 9, 2008 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation on Joint Response to Motion to Remand by Koppers Industries, Inc., Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burnett, Susan)
April 7, 2008 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Brent R. Austin, Paul K. Freeborn, Leonard S. Kurfirst, Robert L. Shuftan; Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 416152. (jk, )
April 7, 2008 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Koppers Industries, Inc., Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company, re #15 Joint MOTION to Sever Pursuant to the Court's October 12, 2006 Order and Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 filed by Defendant Koppers Industries, Inc., Defendant Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company Joint Reply in Support of Their Motion to Sever (Burnett, Susan)
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Kurfirst). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk, )
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Freeborn). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk, )
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Shuftan). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk, )
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Austin). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk, )
April 3, 2008 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Leonard S. Kurfirst on behalf of Koppers Industries, Inc.. (jk, )
April 3, 2008 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul K. Freeborn on behalf of Koppers Industries, Inc.. (jk, )
April 3, 2008 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brent R. Austin on behalf of Koppers Industries, Inc.. (jk, )
April 3, 2008 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert L. Shuftan on behalf of Koppers Industries, Inc.. (jk, )
March 26, 2008 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Eddie M. Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand)(Hankins, Grover)
March 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk, )
March 12, 2008 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Sever Pursuant to the Court's October 12, 2006 Order and Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 by Koppers Industries, Inc., Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibits A-B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibits D-E, #5 Exhibit F (Part 1), #6 Exhibit F (Part 2), #7 Exhibits G-H, #8 Exhibits I-K, #9 Exhibits L-M, #10 Exhibits N-O, #11 Exhibits P-Q)(Burnett, Susan)
March 12, 2008 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation on Their Joint Motion to Sever Pursuant to the Court's October 12, 2006 Order and Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 by Koppers Industries, Inc., Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burnett, Susan)
March 10, 2008 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company.(mc2, )
March 7, 2008 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of Plaintiff's' Motion to Remand by Eddie M. Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Strike Motion to Stay Proceedings)(Hankins, Grover) Modified on 3/10/2008 to add document relationship link (jk, ).
March 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (jk, )
March 6, 2008 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Koppers Industries, Inc., Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company, re #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of Plaintiff's' Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Eddie M. Hamilton (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burnett, Susan)
March 4, 2008 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eddie M. Hamilton #6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of Plaintiff's' Motion to Remand (Hankins, Grover)
March 3, 2008 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by William R. Floyd; Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 415681. (jk, )
March 3, 2008 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William R. Floyd on behalf of Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company. (jk, )
February 29, 2008 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Koppers Industries, Inc.. (jk, )
February 28, 2008 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Until Resolution of Plaintiff's' Motion to Remand by Eddie M. Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hankins, Grover)
February 26, 2008 Filing 5 Letters/Correspondence to attorneys William Floyd and Douglas Poole advising of non-admitted status. (mm5)
February 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to supplement the record with state court filings. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mm5)
February 26, 2008 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company. (Poole, Douglas)
February 25, 2008 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Koppers Industries, Inc., Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company. (mm5)
February 25, 2008 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $350.00; receipt number 415573), filed by Koppers Industries, Inc., Burlington Northern Santa Fe Railway Company. Exhibits not available electronically (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, supplement to JS44, copy of receipt)(mm5).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton et al v. Koppers Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Margaret Pennie
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Frank Quiniero
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: William J. Manas, Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Maxine Lockett
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Demetrius L. Ellis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: James McDonald
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Shanetra Michelle Davis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Euralene Moore
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Hillary Plumber
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Hilario Martinez, Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jonathan Dewayne Moore
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kilroy Fisher
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Robert A. Baxter
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ollie H. Nix
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Audresha Spates
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Dwayne M.A. Ellis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michael Keshawn Scarlett
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Deloise M. Wise
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Anthony Moore
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: James E. Turner
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Edward M. Rogers
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Quantaruis Eugene Devault
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Roman B. Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Dalia Vela
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Vickie Plumber
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Gerry B. Moore
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rickie L. Knox
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Miranda Moore
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Robin L. Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Derrick K. Stringfellow
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Clidy Mae Williams
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ernesto Espinoza
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jermy Johnson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Tarrance Price
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Teresa A. Johnson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Donna Ray
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Annie Lee Lockett
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Wright C. Ratliff
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rodessa Grays
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lonnie Ray Johnson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rufus Lockett
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michael Parker
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Precious Burns
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Willie Wiley
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Duwonn Evans
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: David Williams
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Donnie H. Coleman
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Venessa R. Bryant
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Courtney Parker
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: William J. Manas, III
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lalonda Burns
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: William Louis Carey
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Sherry Ragston
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ruby J. Williams
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Nathan Rogers
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mary Ann Gonzales
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: A. D. Roberson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rhonda Thomas
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Claudis Thurman, Sr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Daisy Mae Scarlett
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lester S. Moore
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ester Ellis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Marcus T. Mathis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Detrenia Burns
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Henry Burns
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michelle Ratliff
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Manuel Mejias
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Darryl Ellis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Barbara Brooks
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Morris Ray
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Shangelia Moore Lewis Kendall
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Leonard Watson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Edna Moore
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Melvia H. Powell
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ashley Batts
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mike C. Vela
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Johonn McGowan, Sr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Chadrick Moore
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Tommie Lee Burns
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kenneth W. Porter
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Richard Moore, Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Royce Dorsey
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Porsha Batts
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rekeida A. Garner
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Susie Townsend
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jateria Turner
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Vester Thomas
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Carolyn Fleming Franklin
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Terry Lynn Burns
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ja'Quentin Powell
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Harlan C. Plumber
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jahla Johnson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Johnnie B. Williams
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Richard L. Brooks
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Paul Johnson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Dataya Cummings
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kiasha Roberts
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jonnisha Cooper
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Christopher S. Moore
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Erica M. Moore
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John M. Vela
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Henry W. Aldridge
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Shanetra Stevenson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michael Tealer
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Louise Cromo
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Robert P. Feltus
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Daisy L. Gentry
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Norris Davis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Alma Roberson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Richard Duran
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Gerald Wayne Roberts
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Sheila Moore
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Clarence Grays
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Danita Michelle Ellis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Sabrina Gordon
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Casie J. Moore
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Linda C. Adams
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Anthony Ray
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Telisha Wiseman
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Latreas Manas
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Latanya Fisher
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Quneisha Roberts
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Patrice Pleasant
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jessie Lee Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jessica Johnson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Bryant O. Gentry
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Anquinsha Cummings
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Marcus Nickerson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lasharde Hall
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Vivian Watson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Alvita C. Arrington
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kaylor L. Brown
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mable Davis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Broderick Batts
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Eric Wilson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Zoccorro Schicle
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Derrick Diggs
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Joystene C. Moore
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Clara Lister
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: James Townsend
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: J. D. Turner
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jasmine Moses
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Katie M. Davis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Charles Polite
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Eclisha Davis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Christopher Michael Spates
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Darryl G. Ellis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Clifton Burns, III
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Charles Townsend
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Clifton J. Burns, Sr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jastazzia Goffinet
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Tracy Cole
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Melissa Mejias
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Otis Roberts, Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brittany Nicole Burnett
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Linda K. Burns
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Barbie D. Carter
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Sandra P. Bass
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Minnie Burns
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Craig Leon Mathis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Patricia Ann Gonzales
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rosalyn V. Spencer
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Chelsea Mitchell
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Princess E. Fisher
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Katherine Feltus
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Inez Davis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jesica McClain
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Florence Gentry Wilson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Tommie Lee Burns, Sr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mary E. Watson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ursala N. McCarty
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Arthur D. Kennerson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mattie J. Carey
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John E. Cooper
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lisa Ann Nickerson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Dorothy Washington
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Krishna McGowan
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Floyd W. Bradley
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Richard Moore, Sr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kevin Dewayne Ford
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ella Mae Johnson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Roscoe McGregor, Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brala D. Swain
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brenda Nicks
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: J.C. Johnson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Linda Givens Lauderdale
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Benice Guyton
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Patrick Pleasant, Sr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Cornola Moore
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Bessie M. Spencer
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ina Cross
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Helen Freeman
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Donna Ruth Johnson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Etta J. Williams
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Onie Mae Turner
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Douglas Ray Burns
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Everlene Reliford
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lacreshia Reliford
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Johnell Johnson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Robert D. Bell, Sr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: William O. Feltus
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Laquitta G. Lister
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Nicole Batts
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brittany Leann Fisher
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Dorothy Mathis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Richard Gonzalez
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Barbarett Stevenson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Billy Hagan
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Eureka S. Rhodes
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Nikita Ray
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Gloria Burns
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Romeo W. Moore
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Georgia Spencer
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ora Lee Price
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kei Amber More
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michael Smith
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Douglas N. Moore
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Alton A. Sweeney, Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Joseph Perez
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Treas Moore Manas
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michelle Mejias Arguello
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Raveen Moore
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jaborie Rucks
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Cassandra Coleman
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rhoda Lee Hall
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Diandrea L. Ellis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: James Simpson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: James Roy Fisher
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Stacie Woodberry
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Barbara McDonald
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Terrance Young
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Bobby Ray Pennie
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Milton E. McNeil, Sr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Leon D. Brinston
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Terry Davis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Tyson Wilson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Herbert C. Plumber, Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Basel L. Lister
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Florence Gentry
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: David Ellis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Deonte Hagan
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rajanae Scyres
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Versie Davis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Debra Coleman
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Deborah Schicle
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Marcus Martinez
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Qurisha Scarlett
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michele Stifflemire
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: William Carey
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lashanda Batts
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Shirley L. Gentry
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Beverly Pleasant
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Mary Woodfork Williams
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Sandra Lee Lister
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Latomia Batts
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jessie L. Burns
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Latasha Moore
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Irene F. Galloway
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Patrick Pleasant, Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rebecca Mathis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rarterrius Schicle
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brandon E. Fisher
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Raymond Lockett, Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Donnell Barrett
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Danita C. Kyles
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Nicraisha Lyon Mathis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Santoya Copeland
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jasmine Batts
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Robert Lee Moore
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Tevin Jamal Johnson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Shawn Micahel Johnson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jo Ann Greene
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Cynthia Washington
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jabari Johnson
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lakeisha Pleasant
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Tanette L. Roberts
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Lillie M. Gentry
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jaycee Young
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Corey C. Jeffery
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Wallace Taylor
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Valencia Davis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Loretta D. Ellis
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brandon T. Adams
Represented By: Michael R. Wills, III
Represented By: Grover G. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [