Del Bosque v. AT&T Advertising, L.P.
Plaintiff: Sylvia Del Bosque
Defendant: AT&T Advertising, L.P.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00402
Filed: May 27, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Travis
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS to DENY 78 Motion to Amend Complaint filed by Sylvia Del Bosque. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (mm5, )
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING 34 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (mc2, )
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 29 Motion to Intervene filed by Wilde Ricardi, PLLC. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (E-mailed copy of this document to plaintiff 1/14/10) (mc2, ) Modified on 1/14/2010 to add text (mc2, ).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Bosque v. AT&T Advertising, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Del Bosque
Represented By: Alicia Ana Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Advertising, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?