National Western Life Insurance Company v. Western National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: National Western Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Western National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2009cv00711
Filed: September 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
County: Travis
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER DENYING 259 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (mc2, )
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER DENYING 232 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Robert A. Leonard filed by National Western Life Insurance Company, DENYING 68 Opposed MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Kent Van Liere filed by National Western Life Insurance Company, DENYING 75 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Gabriel Gelb Under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 filed by Western National Life Insurance Company, AGC Life Insurance Company, GRANTING 65 MOTION to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert Jef frey M. Samuels Under Federal Rule of Evidence 702 filed by Western National Life Insurance Company, AGC Life Insurance Company, DENYING 122 MOTION to Exclude Certain Testimony of Kenneth Kehrer, and Brief in Support filed by National Western Life Insurance Company, GRANTING 78 MOTION to Exclude filed by Western National Life Insurance Company, AGC Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jk, )
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER GRANTING 107 Motion to Quash; GRANTING 107 Motion for Protective Order; DENYING 110 Motion to Compel; GRANTING 114 Motion to Compel; DENYING 118 Motion to Compel Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (mc2, )
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 108 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Western Life Insurance Company v. Western National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Western Life Insurance Company
Represented By: J. Roger Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?