Aubrey et al v. Barlin et al
Case Number: 1:2010cv00076
Filed: January 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Sam Sparks
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1367 - Deceptive Trade Practices Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 768 ORDER DENYING 754 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (dm)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 767 ORDER GRANTING 760 Motion for Reconsideration ; GRANTING 761 Motion for Reconsideration; MOOTING 766 Motion for Reconsideration. This Courts April 18, 2016 Order granting Motions for Sanctions and Attorney Fees is VACATED. (Dkt. # 757.) Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (dm)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 757 ORDER GRANTING 716 Motion for Sanctions; GRANTING 717 Motion for Sanctions; GRANTING 744 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (dm)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 747 ORDER DENYING 695 Motion to Unseal Document ; DENYING 698 Motion to Sever. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (dm)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 736 This Court orders Plaintiffs Brian Vodicka and Steve Aubrey to file an unredacted copy of the Order of Protective Custody currently filed as Exhibit A to Mr. Aubreys Motion for Extension of Time (Dkt. # 729 at 5). Mr. Vodicka and Mr. Aubrey are ORDERED to file this document UNDER SEAL by 10:00 a.m. CST, on Monday, March 14, 2016. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (dm)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 733 ORDER DENYING 729 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; DENYING 731 Motion for Reconsideration, DENYING 732 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (dm)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 727 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 725 Motion for Filing Privileges. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (os)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 723 ORDER MOOTING 718 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; GRANTING 719 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 719 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motions. Plaintiffs deadlines to respond to the motions are extended by seven (7) days. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (os)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 687 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendant Barlin's 674 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; DENYING Defendant Lahr's 675 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendant Gunn's 676 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs oral motion to amend their pleadings to include a claim for conspiracy is GRANTED. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (klw)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 648 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Recommends 624 Motion in Limine filed by Brian E. Vodicka, Steven B. Aubrey be Granted in Part, Denied in Part and Dismissed as Moot; Recommends 622 Motion in Limine filed by Peter E. Barlin be Granted in Part, Denied in Part and Dismissed as Moot. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (os)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 589 Motion to exclude Testimony of Edmond Martin; GRANTING IN PART 591 Motion to exclude Untimely Disclosed Expert Testimony; GRANTING 599 Motion to exclude Testimony of John R. Fahy; GRANTING 607 Motion to exclude Testimony of Joyce Weedman. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (os)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER DENYING 600 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (dm)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 536 ORDER MOOTING 453 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; GRANTING 470 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; DENYING 471 Motion to Dismiss. Terminated party Jeffrey Turner, Lesley Karen Williams, Vitaly Zaretsky, Nort h American Title Company and North American Title Company.; GRANTING 475 Motion to Dismiss. Terminated party Jeffrey Turner, Lesley Karen Williams, Vitaly Zaretsky, North American Title Company and North American Title Company.; DENYING 476 Mot ion to Dismiss. Terminated party Jeffrey Turner, Lesley Karen Williams, Vitaly Zaretsky, North American Title Company and North American Title Company.; GRANTING 477 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; DENYING 478 Motion to Dismiss. Terminated party Jeffrey Turner, Lesley Karen Williams, Vitaly Zaretsky, North American Title Company and North American Title Company.; DENYING 480 Motion to Dismiss. Terminated party Jeffrey Turner, Lesley Karen Williams, Vitaly Zaretsky, North American Title Company and North American Title Company.; GRANTING 482 Motion to Dismiss. Terminated party Jeffrey Turner, Lesley Karen Williams, Vitaly Zaretsky, North American Title Company and North American Title Company.; GRANTING 506 Motion for Leave to File; GRANTING 510 Motion for Leave to File Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm)
December 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 465 ORDER DENYING 347 Motion to Compel; GRANTING 353 Motion for Attorney Fees; MOOTING 373 Motion to Substitute; GRANTING 379 Motion to Quash; MOOTING 384 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; DISMISSING 396 Motion to Withdraw as At torney. ; GRANTING 413 Motion to Quash; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 424 Motion to Compel; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 425 Motion for Leave to Conduct Additional Depositions; GRANTING 428 Motion to Quash; GRANTING 430 Motion to Quash; GRANTING 431 Motion for Protective Order; GRANTING 438 Motion to Join. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER GRANTING 369 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; GRANTING 386 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines; GRANTING 386 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; GRANTING 401 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; DISMISSING as M oot 412 Motion to Quash; DISMISSING as Moot 415 Motion to Quash; GRANTING 422 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; GRANTING 429 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; GRANTING 441 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (jk)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER MOOTING 83 Motion for Entry of Proposed Scheduling Order; DENYING 90 Motion to Dismiss ; DENYING 92 Motion to Dismiss ; DENYING 95 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING 66 Motion to Dismiss. Terminated party Mitchell E. Savrick and Savrick Schumann Johnson McGarr Kaminski & Shirley, LLP; GRANTING 69 Motion to Dismiss. Terminated party Mark E. Schiffgens and Sandra F. Gunn; DENYING 72 Motion to Dismiss. GRANTING 73 Motion to Dismiss. Terminated party Peter E. Barlin. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (mh2, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aubrey et al v. Barlin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?