Deliverance Poker, LLC v. Tiltware, LLC et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Deliverance Poker, LLC
Defendant: Michael Mizrachi and Tiltware, LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv00664
Filed: September 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Nowlin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2011 Filing 91 FINAL JUDGMENT. This action is DISMISSED without Prejudice. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (klw, )
March 21, 2011 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin. (mc2, )
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING 61 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (mc2, )
March 21, 2011 Filing 89 MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant Tiltware, LLC's Expert and Memorandum in Support by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (Jacks, John)
March 17, 2011 Filing 88 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Tiltware, LLC's Reply Regarding Expedited Motion to Continue Trial Date and Discovery Cutoff or Bifurcate or Sever by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (Jacks, John)
March 16, 2011 Filing 87 AFFIDAVIT in Support of 86 Reply to Response to Motion, to Continue Trial Date and Discovery Cutoff or Bifurcate or Sever Claims Against Tiltware by Tiltware, LLC. (Bessette, Paul)
March 16, 2011 Filing 86 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Tiltware, LLC, re 67 MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Discovery Cutoff or Bifurcate or Sever Claims Against Tiltware MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Defendant Tiltware, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Bessette, Paul)
March 15, 2011 Filing 85 Pretrial Disclosures Disclosure of Expert Testimony by Tiltware, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Bessette, Paul)
March 15, 2011 Filing 84 WITNESS/EXHIBIT/EXPERT LIST by Michael Mizrachi, Tiltware, LLC. (Henry, John)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER CANCELLING discovery hearing set for 03/22/11 before Judge Austin. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (klw, )
March 11, 2011 Filing 82 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Deliverance Poker, LLC, re 55 MOTION to Dismiss Cause of Action for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Tiltware, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Order)(Jacks, John)
March 11, 2011 Filing 81 Order terminating mediation deadling set for 03/21/2011. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (klw, ) (klw, ).
March 11, 2011 Filing 80 SUPPLEMENT to 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 74 Reply to Response to Motion by Tiltware, LLC. (Bessette, Paul)
March 11, 2011 Filing 79 RESPONSE and Declaration of Jordan D. Grotzinger to 76 Order by Tiltware, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bessette, Paul)
March 11, 2011 Filing 78 NOTICE of Filing Plaintiff's Compliance with Court's Order to Provide Evidence as to Mizrachi's Membership Status by Deliverance Poker, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Jacks, John)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Setting Hearing on 67 MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Discovery Cutoff or Bifurcate or Sever Claims Against Tiltware MOTION to Bifurcate, 59 MOTION for Protective Order for Deposition of Michael Mizrachi, 72 Second MOTION to Compel, 71 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Chris Porter. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2011 10:00 AM before Judge Andrew W. Austin. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (klw, )
March 10, 2011 Text Order GRANTING 70 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jordan D. Grotzinger). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge James R. Nowlin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bjm)
March 10, 2011 Text Order GRANTING 69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (George M. Belfield). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge James R. Nowlin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bjm)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER that parties file Articles of Formation by 03/11/11 at 2:00 p.m.; Admonishment re: sanctions for frivolous filings. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (klw, )
March 10, 2011 Filing 75 AFFIDAVIT in Support of 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 74 Reply to Response to Motion Declaration of Jordan D. Grotzinger by Tiltware, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Errata B)(Bessette, Paul)
March 10, 2011 Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Tiltware, LLC, re 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Tiltware, LLC (Bessette, Paul)
March 9, 2011 Filing 73 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Deliverance Poker, LLC, re 67 MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Discovery Cutoff or Bifurcate or Sever Claims Against Tiltware MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Defendant Tiltware, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Proposed Order)(Jacks, John)
March 9, 2011 Filing 72 Second MOTION to Compel by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (Jacks, John)
March 8, 2011 Filing 71 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition of Chris Porter by Tiltware, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (Henry, John)
March 8, 2011 Filing 70 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul R. Bessette for Jordan D. Grotzinger ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-3457802) by on behalf of Tiltware, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (Bessette, Paul)
March 8, 2011 Filing 69 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul R. Bessette for George M. Belfield ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-3457745) by on behalf of Tiltware, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (Bessette, Paul)
March 8, 2011 Filing 68 AFFIDAVIT in Support of 67 MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Discovery Cutoff or Bifurcate or Sever Claims Against Tiltware Declaration of George M. Belfield by Tiltware, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Bessette, Paul)
March 8, 2011 Filing 67 MOTION to Continue Trial Date and Discovery Cutoff or Bifurcate or Sever Claims Against Tiltware by Tiltware, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (Bessette, Paul). Added MOTION to Bifurcate on 3/9/2011 (klw, ).
March 8, 2011 Filing 66 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Deliverance Poker, LLC, re 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Tiltware, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Proposed Order)(Jacks, John)
March 8, 2011 Filing 65 Letters to George Balfield and Jordan Grotzinger re: non-admitted status. (klw, )
March 8, 2011 Filing 64 AFFIDAVIT in Support of 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 62 Affidavit in Support Corrected Declaration of Jordan D. Grotzinger by Tiltware, LLC. (Bessette, Paul)
March 8, 2011 Filing 63 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Paul R. Bessette: re 62 Affidavit in Support. (klw, )
March 7, 2011 Filing 62 AFFIDAVIT in Support Declaration of Jordan Z. Grotzinger in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Tiltware, LLC. (Bessette, Paul)
March 7, 2011 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Tiltware, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). (Bessette, Paul) Modified on 3/8/2011 to remove reference to referral judge (klw, ).
March 7, 2011 Filing 60 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul R. Bessette on behalf of Tiltware, LLC Notice of Appearance of Co-Counsel - Paul R. Bessette, R. Adam Swick, George Belfield, Jordan Grotzinger and the firm of Greenberg Trauring, LLP (Bessette, Paul)
March 5, 2011 Filing 59 MOTION for Protective Order for Deposition of Michael Mizrachi by Michael Mizrachi. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (Henry, John)
March 3, 2011 Filing 58 Exhibit List Supplement by Deliverance Poker, LLC.. (Jacks, John)
March 1, 2011 Filing 57 WITNESS/EXHIBIT/EXPERT LIST by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Becker, Douglas)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. ADR Report Deadline due by 3/21/2011; Status Conference set for 4/21/2011 02:00 PM before Judge James R. Nowlin; Jury Selection / Trial set for 4/25/2011 09:00AM before Judge James R. Nowlin. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (klw, )
February 28, 2011 Motion No Longer Referred: 55 MOTION to Dismiss Cause of Action for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). (klw, )
February 28, 2011 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss Cause of Action for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Tiltware, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order).
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING 44 Motion to Compel; GRANTING 53 Supplemental Motion to Compel. IT IS ORDERED that Mizrachi and Tiltware pay to Deliverance $1,500.00 for the attorneys fees incurred by Deliverance in filing the motion tocompel. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (jk, )
February 17, 2011 Filing 53 Supplemental MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (Becker, Douglas)
February 14, 2011 Text Order GRANTING 51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Ian J. Imrich). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge James R. Nowlin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bjm)
February 11, 2011 Text Order GRANTING 52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Aimee Lane). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge James R. Nowlin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bjm)
February 11, 2011 Filing 52 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Paul Henry on behalf of Aimee Lane ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-3396308) by on behalf of Tiltware, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (Henry, John)
February 11, 2011 Filing 51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Paul Henry on behalf of Ian J. Imrich ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-3396305) by on behalf of Tiltware, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (Henry, John)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (jk, )
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING 38 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (klw, )
February 10, 2011 Filing 48 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Mizrachi, Tiltware, LLC amending 1 Complaint, filed by Deliverance Poker, LLC.(klw, )
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING 43 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (klw, )
January 26, 2011 Filing 46 ATTACHMENT to 44 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Memorandum in Support by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacks, John)
January 25, 2011 Filing 45 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Jacks, John)
January 25, 2011 Filing 44 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Memorandum in Support by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Jacks, John)
January 17, 2011 Filing 43 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Third Amended Complaint, # 2 Proposed Order)(Jacks, John)
January 10, 2011 Filing 42 Original ANSWER to 32 Second Amended Complaint by Tiltware, LLC.(Henry, John) Modified on 1/11/2011 to modify text (klw, ).
January 4, 2011 Filing 41 ADR Report Filed - by Deliverance Poker, LLC, Michael Mizrachi(Jacks, John)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 38 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by Deliverance Poker, LLC. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (mc2, )
December 27, 2010 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deliverance Poker, LLC. Tiltware, LLC served on 12/8/2010, answer due 12/29/2010. (Jacks, John)
December 21, 2010 Filing 38 Opposed MOTION for Protective Order by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Becker, Douglas)
December 13, 2010 Filing 37 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Becker, Douglas)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 1/4/2011. Amended Pleadings due by 1/18/2011. Discovery due by 3/25/2011. Joinder of Parties due by 1/18/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 3/28/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2011 02:00 PM before Judge James R. Nowlin. Jury Selection and Trial set for 4/25/2011 09:00 AM before Judge James R. Nowlin. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (klw, )
December 10, 2010 Filing 35 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by Deliverance Poker, LLC, Michael Mizrachi. (Becker, Douglas)
December 8, 2010 Filing 34 Summons Issued as to Tiltware, LLC. (klw, )
December 7, 2010 Filing 33 (Copy of Second Amended Complaint and) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Request for Summons)(Becker, Douglas) Modified on 12/8/2010 to modify text (klw, ).
December 7, 2010 Filing 32 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Mizrachi, Tiltware, LLC amending 21 First Amended Complaint, filed by Deliverance Poker, LLC.(klw, )
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Partially Unopposed 29 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (klw, )
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DENYING Parties' Joint 28 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines. Proposed Scheduling Order is due on or before 12/10/10. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (klw, )
November 29, 2010 Filing 29 Partially Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and Memorandum in Support by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Amended Complaint)(Becker, Douglas) Modified on 11/30/2010 to clarify text (klw, ).
November 29, 2010 Filing 28 Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines by Deliverance Poker, LLC, Michael Mizrachi. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Becker, Douglas)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING 26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (jk, )
November 18, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION to Withdraw by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jacks, John).
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER MOOTING 2 Motion for application for preliminary injunction; GRANTING 24 Motion to cancel hearing on application for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (mc2, )
October 29, 2010 Filing 24 MOTION to Cancel Hearing on Application for Preliminary Injunction by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Demond, William)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING 22 Motion to Accelerate Hearing Date on Application for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (td)
October 20, 2010 Filing 22 MOTION to Expedite Hearing Date on Application for Preliminary Injunction by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Accelerate Hearing Date)(Becker, Douglas)
October 18, 2010 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Michael Mizrachi amending 1 Complaint, filed by Deliverance Poker, LLC.(td)
October 18, 2010 Filing 20 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Demond, William)
October 18, 2010 Text Order GRANTING 19 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge James R. Nowlin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bjm)
October 15, 2010 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Motion for Leave to Amend and File First Amended Complaint and Brief in Support by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Demond, William)
October 15, 2010 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Jacks on behalf of Deliverance Poker, LLC Notice of Appearance of Co-Counsel - Richard E. Gray, III, Douglas M. Becker, John D. Jacks, and the firm of Gray & Becker, P.C. (Jacks, John)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED that Plaintiff provide Michael Mizrachi and Tiltware, LLC notice of the preliminary injunction hearing along with copy of its Original Complaint... FURTHER ORDERED that Pltf file with this Court, on or before October 19, 2010, proof that notice of the preliminary-injunction hearing has been provided... FINALLY ORDERED that Pltf will be subject to civil contempt if it fails to comply with this Order.Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (td, )
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Cancelling Hearing for Thursday, October 14, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. 2 MOTION Injunctive Relief (Motion Hearing reset for 11/9/2010 02:00 PM before Judge James R. Nowlin.). Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (td)
October 12, 2010 Filing 15 Letter from Deliverance Poker, LLC. (td)
October 8, 2010 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Deliverance Poker, LLC Without Prejudice (Demond, William)
October 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to file copies of the notice given to Defendants re: 11 ORDER that plaintiff provide notice of hearing, copy of complaint and injuntive motion documents to defendant, and Setting Hearing. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (jk, )
September 29, 2010 Filing 12 Defendant Michael Mizrachi's Original ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Michael Mizrachi.(Henry, John)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that plaintiff provide notice of hearing, copy of complaint and injuntive motion documents to defendant, and Setting Hearing on 2 MOTION Injunctive Relief : Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2010 02:00 PM before Judge James R. Nowlin.. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (mc2, )
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER revoking referral of Motion Requesting Injunctive Relief to Magistrate Judge, Motions No Longer Referred: 2 MOTION Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (mc2, )
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER follows text order: Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (mc2, )
September 10, 2010 Notice of Correction: re Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. The docket entry information has been corrected to link the text order to the Amended memorandum filed 9/10/10, rather than the motion filed 9/7/10. (mc2, )
September 10, 2010 Text Order DENYING 8 Amended Memorandum in support of Motion entered by Judge James R. Nowlin. Explanatory Order to follow as soon as possible. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bjm) Modified on 9/10/2010 to correct linkage(mc2, ).
September 10, 2010 Filing 8 AMENDED Memorandum in Support of 2 MOTION Injunctive Relief (Temporary Restraining Order) by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Proposed Order)(klw, )
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 2 MOTION Injunctive Relief filed by Deliverance Poker, LLC for report and recommendation. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Robert Pitman. (mc2, )
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER follows oral order: Order on Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (mc2, )
September 8, 2010 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Michael Mizrachi, Tiltware, LLC. (td)
September 8, 2010 Text Order DENYING 3 Motion for TRO entered by Judge James R. Nowlin. An explanatory order will be entered as soon as possible. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bjm)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James R. Nowlin for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
September 7, 2010 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(td)
September 7, 2010 Filing 2 MOTION Injunctive Relief by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (klw, )
September 7, 2010 Filing 1 Plaintiff's Original COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 100007599), filed by Deliverance Poker, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet /Receipt)(klw, )
September 7, 2010 Case Assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (klw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deliverance Poker, LLC v. Tiltware, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deliverance Poker, LLC
Represented By: Douglas M. Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mizrachi
Represented By: John Paul Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiltware, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?