Ransom et al v. M. Patel Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vernon K. Henneman, Jr., Lori A. Hopmann, Bonnie Kurz, Daniel W. Owings and Abigail F. Ransom
Defendant: Jaymini Amin, M. Patel Enterprises, Inc. and Mitesh M. Patel
Case Number: 1:2010cv00857
Filed: November 12, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Nowlin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 202 Motion for Supersedeas Bond; that no later than July 20, 2012, the Defendants post $478,180.25; DENYING AS MOOT 199 Motion to Appoint Receiver and for Turnover Relief. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (kkc, )
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER GRANTING 181 Motion for Attorney Fees and Related Non-Taxable Expenses; GRANTING 191 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER DENYING 128 Motion to Open and Close Evidence and Case; DENYING 135 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Original Answer. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER DENYING 83 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Proper Measure of Damages; DENYING 84 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: Overtime Calculation Methodology. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER DENYING without prejudice Motion for Summary Judgment 53 ; DENYING without prejudice Motions for Partial Summary Judgment 76 & 78 . Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 45 Motion to Compel Production of Documents Relevant to the Plaintiffs' Job Duties. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ransom et al v. M. Patel Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaymini Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Patel Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitesh M. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernon K. Henneman, Jr.
Represented By: Edmond S Moreland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori A. Hopmann
Represented By: Edmond S Moreland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Kurz
Represented By: Edmond S Moreland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel W. Owings
Represented By: Edmond S Moreland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abigail F. Ransom
Represented By: Edmond S Moreland, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?