Armstrong v. United States Anti-Doping Agency et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Lance Armstrong
Defendant: Travis Tygart and United States Anti-Doping Agency
Case Number: 1:2012cv00606
Filed: July 9, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Sam Sparks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc, )
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Travis Tygart and United States Anti-Doping Agency's 33 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc, ) (Main Document 56 replaced on 8/20/2012) (kkc, ).
August 17, 2012 Filing 55 BRIEF regarding 52 Status Conference, by Travis Tygart, United States Anti-Doping Agency USADA's Supplemental Letter Brief. (Bock, William)
August 17, 2012 Filing 54 BRIEF regarding 52 Status Conference, by Lance Armstrong. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Tim Herman)(Herman, Timothy)
August 14, 2012 Filing 53 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on August 10,2012, Proceedings Transcribed: Pending Matters. Court Reporter/Transcriber Paige S. Watts. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 9/4/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/14/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2012. (tr, )
August 10, 2012 Filing 52 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Status Conference held on 8/10/2012. Motion #33 taken under advisement, Supplemental Letter Briefs due in 7 days, written order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Paige Watts.)(dm, )
August 9, 2012 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Lance Armstrong, re 33 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss or Stay Under the Federal Arbitration Act) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss or Stay Under the Federal Arbitration Act) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss or Stay Under the Federal Arbitration Act) filed by Defendant Travis Tygart, Defendant United States Anti-Doping Agency Sur-Reply (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Tim Herman, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 29, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 30)(Herman, Timothy)
August 8, 2012 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Travis Tygart, United States Anti-Doping Agency, re 33 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss or Stay Under the Federal Arbitration Act) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss or Stay Under the Federal Arbitration Act) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss or Stay Under the Federal Arbitration Act) filed by Defendant Travis Tygart, Defendant United States Anti-Doping Agency (Powers, Matthew)
August 7, 2012 Filing 49 Affidavit of Shawn O. Farrell in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lance Armstrong, re 33 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss or Stay Under the Federal Arbitration Act) filed by Defendant Travis Tygart, Defendant United States Anti-Doping Agency. (kkc, )
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING 47 Motion for Leave to File Affidavit of Shawn Farrell. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc, )
August 7, 2012 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to file Affidavit of Shawn Farrell by Lance Armstrong. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Herman, Timothy)
August 6, 2012 Filing 46 NOTICE of USADA's Withdrawal of Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Travis Tygart, United States Anti-Doping Agency re 44 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation (Bock, William)
August 3, 2012 Filing 45 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lance Armstrong, re 33 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss or Stay Under the Federal Arbitration Act) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss or Stay Under the Federal Arbitration Act) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss or Stay Under the Federal Arbitration Act) filed by Defendant Travis Tygart, Defendant United States Anti-Doping Agency (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Tim Herman, # 2 Exhibit #1, # 3 Exhibit #2, # 4 Exhibit #3, # 5 Exhibit #4, # 6 Exhibit #5, # 7 Exhibit #6, # 8 Exhibit #7, # 9 Exhibit #8, # 10 Exhibit #9, # 11 Exhibit #10, # 12 Exhibit #11, # 13 Exhibit #12, # 14 Exhibit #13, # 15 Exhibit #14, # 16 Exhibit #15, # 17 Exhibit #16, # 18 Exhibit #17, # 19 Exhibit #18, # 20 Exhibit #19, # 21 Exhibit #20, # 22 Exhibit #21, # 23 Exhibit #22, # 24 Exhibit #23, # 25 Exhibit #24, # 26 Exhibit #25, # 27 Exhibit #26, # 28 Exhibit #27, # 29 Exhibit #28, # 30 Proposed Order)(Herman, Timothy)
August 3, 2012 Filing 44 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Lance Armstrong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Herman, Timothy)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
August 3, 2012 Filing 42 NOTICE of Defendants' Submission of Corrected Exhibits by Travis Tygart, United States Anti-Doping Agency re 40 Response to Motion,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit -C-, # 2 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit -D-)(Bock, William)
August 3, 2012 Filing 41 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to 40 Response to Motion,, by Travis Tygart, United States Anti-Doping Agency. (Bock, William)
August 3, 2012 Filing 40 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Travis Tygart, United States Anti-Doping Agency, USADA's Response to Plaintiff's "Consent Motion" (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit -A- August 2, 2012, Attorney E-Mail Exchange, # 2 Exhibit -B- August 2, 2012, Email from Sean Breen to William Bock, # 3 Exhibit -C- First July 13, 2012, Letter from UCI to USADA, # 4 Exhibit -D- Second July 13, 2012, Letter from UCI to USADA, # 5 Exhibit -E- August 3, 2012, Letter from UCI to USADA)(Bock, William)
August 2, 2012 Filing 39 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 33 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss or Stay Under the Federal Arbitration Act) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss or Stay Under the Federal Arbitration Act) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss or Stay Under the Federal Arbitration Act) by Lance Armstrong. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Herman, Timothy)
July 23, 2012 Filing 38 NOTICE of Filing Defendants' Notice of Correction Regarding Exhibit 2 to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, In the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss or Stay Under the Federal Arbitration Act by Travis Tygart, United States Anti-Doping Agency (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dershowitz Affidavit)(Powers, Matthew)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING 31 Motion for Brent E. Rychener to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc, )
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING 30 Motion for Richard R. Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc, )
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING 29 Motion for William Bock, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc, )
July 20, 2012 Filing 34 NOTICE of Filing Index of Exhibits to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, In the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss or Stay Under the Federal Arbitration Act by Travis Tygart, United States Anti-Doping Agency (Powers, Matthew)
July 19, 2012 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss or Stay Under the Federal Arbitration Act) by Travis Tygart, United States Anti-Doping Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Chart), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Dershowitz), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Tygart - Part 1 of 3), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Tygart - Part 2 of 3), # 5 Exhibit 3 (Tygart - Part 3 of 3), # 6 Exhibit 4 (Tomlonovic - Part 1 of 2), # 7 Exhibit 4 (Tomlonovic - Part 2 of 2), # 8 Exhibit 5 (Farrell), # 9 Proposed Order)(Powers, Matthew)
July 19, 2012 Filing 32 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Travis Tygart, United States Anti-Doping Agency (Defendants' Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement). (Powers, Matthew)
July 19, 2012 Filing 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew C. Powers for Attorney Brent E. Rychener ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-4757035) by on behalf of Travis Tygart, United States Anti-Doping Agency. (Powers, Matthew)
July 19, 2012 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew C. Powers for Attorney Richard R. Young ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-4757018) by on behalf of Travis Tygart, United States Anti-Doping Agency. (Powers, Matthew)
July 19, 2012 Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew C. Powers for Attorney William Bock, III ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0542-4756970) by on behalf of Travis Tygart, United States Anti-Doping Agency. (Powers, Matthew)
July 16, 2012 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lance Armstrong. United States Anti-Doping Agency served on 7/13/2012, answer due 8/3/2012. (Herman, Timothy)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Marcie Ziegler. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ana Reyes. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
July 16, 2012 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lance Armstrong. Travis Tygart served on 7/13/2012, answer due 8/3/2012. (Herman, Timothy)
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Patrick J. Slevin. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert D. Luskin. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mark S. Levinstein. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER, ( Status Conference/Hearing on all pending matters set for 8/10/2012 02:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks.). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
July 12, 2012 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Travis Tygart, United States Anti-Doping Agency. (dm, )
July 12, 2012 Filing 19 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lance Armstrong. for Amended Complaint (Herman, Timothy)
July 10, 2012 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Lance Armstrong.(Herman, Timothy)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING 2 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (dm, )
July 9, 2012 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Travis Tygart, United States Anti-Doping Agency. (dm, )
July 9, 2012 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lance Armstrong. CORRECTED (Herman, Timothy)
July 9, 2012 Filing 14 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 8 Request for Issuance of Summons. (dm, )
July 9, 2012 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lance Armstrong. (Herman, Timothy)
July 9, 2012 Filing 7 ATTACHMENT Continued Exhibits to 4 Affidavit in Support,, by Lance Armstrong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 34, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 35, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 36, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 37, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 38, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 39, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 40, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 41, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 42 through 47, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 48 and 49, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 50 and 51)(Herman, Timothy)
July 9, 2012 Filing 6 ATTACHMENT Exhibits to 4 Affidavit in Support,, by Lance Armstrong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Continued Exhibit 33, # 2 Exhibit Continued Exhibit 33, # 3 Exhibit Continued Exhibit 33)(Herman, Timothy)
July 9, 2012 Filing 5 ATTACHMENT Continued Exhibits to 4 Affidavit in Support,, by Lance Armstrong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Herman, Timothy)
July 9, 2012 Case Assigned to Judge Sam Sparks. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jk, )
July 9, 2012 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT in Support of 3 Memorandum in Support, 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Lance Armstrong. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit, # 18 Exhibit, # 19 Exhibit, # 20 Exhibit, # 21 Exhibit, # 22 Exhibit, # 23 Errata, # 24 Exhibit, # 25 Exhibit, # 26 Exhibit, # 27 Exhibit, # 28 Exhibit, # 29 Exhibit, # 30 Exhibit)(Herman, Timothy)
July 9, 2012 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support of 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Lance Armstrong. (Herman, Timothy)
July 9, 2012 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Lance Armstrong. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Order)(Herman, Timothy)
July 9, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0542-4723246), filed by Lance Armstrong. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herman, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. United States Anti-Doping Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Armstrong
Represented By: Sean E. Breen
Represented By: Timothy J. Herman
Represented By: Mark S. Levinstein
Represented By: Robert D. Luskin
Represented By: Ana C. Reyes
Represented By: Patrick J. Slevin
Represented By: Marcie R. Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Tygart
Represented By: Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody
Represented By: Matthew C. Powers
Represented By: Brent E. Rychener
Represented By: Richard R. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Anti-Doping Agency
Represented By: Graves Dougherty Hearon & Moody
Represented By: Matthew C. Powers
Represented By: Brent E. Rychener
Represented By: Richard R. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?