Barnes v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Carolyn Barnes
Defendant: Lisa David, John Bradley, Nick Richter, Pete Hughey, Erin Cargile, Lloyd Doug Shaver, Zach Ryall, Josh Reno, Another That Knows, Linda Acevedo, Geoffrey Puryear, Melissa Hightower, Judith Gres Deberry, Dee Hobbs, Travis McDonald, Robert Gremillion, Harold Poppa, Jim Bergamo, One That Knows, Russell Travis, Robert Newell, Robert Kee, Austin Legal Blog, Alan Schreiber, Jake LNU, Paul Jordan, Dale Rye, John Foster, Jereme Brinkmann, Suzanne Brooks, Liberals R. Clueless, Kirk Cole, Kathleen Gittel, Michael Scheffler, John Delaney, MRPBEAR, FNU Cotton, Third Court of Appeals, Lacey Loftin, Guilford Jones, Elizabeth Cunningham, KVUE-TV, Austin American Statesman, Donna Tiemann Connell, Deborah Klekar, Robert Chapman, Paul Bogan, Richard Coons, Bill Swaim, KEYE, Dusty Humes, Irma Guerrero, Ken Paxton, Doug Waggoner, Ron Morgan, Noelle Newton, Ken Anderson, D. Hernandez, Nativeson, David Ruppart, Storey Sherouse, Anonymous, Todd Dudley, Richard de la Vega, KXAN Austin News, Supreme Court of Texas, Teresa Hall, Shannon Hooks, Hurst, Dennis G. Tumlinson, Marty Griffith, Robert Lerma, Michelle Borynski, Burt Carnes, Gail Johnson, Scott Burn, Belinda Bartz, Robert McCabe and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2015cv00298
Filed: April 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2016 Filing 118 Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE (15-50729) Affirming the District Court re: #98 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory filed by Carolyn Barnes. (td)
April 26, 2016 Filing 117 Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE (#16-50142) Dismissing for want of prosecution #114 Notice of Appeal, filed by Carolyn Barnes. The appellant failed to timely file appellant's brief and record excerpts. (td)
March 1, 2016 Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re #114 Notice of Appeal. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (td)
February 26, 2016 Filing 116 Costs Taxed in the amount of $2513.85 against Carolyn Barnes. (td)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #115 Motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rc)
February 12, 2016 Filing 115 MOTION to proceed In Forma Pauperis on appeal by Carolyn Barnes. (dm)
February 12, 2016 Filing 114 NOTICE OF APPEAL (no filing fee submitted) by Carolyn Barnes. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out #Form DKT-13 (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (dm)
February 4, 2016 Filing 113 BILL OF COSTS by United States of America. (Richter, Zachary)
January 21, 2016 Filing 112 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for #100 #102 Report and Recommendations, #107 Motion to Strike filed by Carolyn Barnes, #94 Motion to Dismiss filed by Harold Poppa, United States of America, #86 Motion Challenging Standing of the United States filed by Carolyn Barnes. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
November 9, 2015 Filing 110 RESPONSE to #108 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Harold Poppa, United States of America. (Richter, Zachary)
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #109 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant's response is due on or before 11/9/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rc)
October 29, 2015 Filing 109 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Objections to #102 Magistrate's Report and Recommendations by Kathleen Gittel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (Richter, Zachary) Modified on 10/29/2015 to add relationship (os).
October 19, 2015 Filing 108 OBJECTION to #102 Report and Recommendations by Carolyn Barnes. (td)
October 16, 2015 Filing 107 MOTION to Strike #81 Report and Recommendations, #100 Report and Recommendations, #102 Report and Recommendations by Carolyn Barnes.. Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (os)
October 16, 2015 Filing 106 OBJECTION to #81 #100 , #102 Report and Recommendations by Carolyn Barnes. (os)
October 14, 2015 Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re #98 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (td)
October 13, 2015 Filing 105 Certified mail acknowledgment receipt for magistrate report and recommendations #102 as to Carolyn Barnes. (td)
October 9, 2015 Filing 104 Certified mailacknowledgment receipt for magistrate report and recommendations re #100 Report and Recommendations as to Carolyn Barnes. (td)
October 5, 2015 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin. (os)
October 5, 2015 Filing 103 Certified Mail Receipt of #102 Report and Recommendations. (td)
October 5, 2015 Filing 102 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #94 Motion to Dismiss filed by Harold Poppa, United States of America. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
October 2, 2015 Filing 101 Certified Mail Receipt of #100 Report and Recommendations. (td)
October 2, 2015 Filing 100 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #86 Motion Challenging Standing of United States filed by Carolyn Barnes. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #99 Motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal entered by Judge Andrew W. Austin. After reviewing Barnes' motion it is clear that she is indigent.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pl)
August 3, 2015 Filing 99 MOTION to proceed In Forma Pauperis on appeal by Carolyn Barnes. Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
August 3, 2015 Filing 98 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #97 Order Adopting/Rejecting Report and Recommendations, by Carolyn Barnes. Filing fee $505 DUE. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out #Form DKT-13 (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (td)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #81 Report and Recommendations, #96 Motion to Strike filed by Carolyn Barnes, #4 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by United States of America, Kathleen Gittel. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
July 21, 2015 Filing 96 MOTION to Strike #81 Report and Recommendations by Carolyn Barnes.. Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
July 21, 2015 Filing 95 OBJECTION to #81 Report and Recommendations by Carolyn Barnes. (td)
July 20, 2015 Filing 94 MOTION to Dismiss by Harold Poppa, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 2d Paniszczyn Certification)(Richter, Zachary)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER DENYING Barnes' #91 Motion to Enter Findings of Facts and Conclusions of Law. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER for the Clerk to sent a second copy of the #81 Report and Recommendations to Barnes via regular mail and via CMRRR. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw)
July 16, 2015 Copy of #92 Order, #93 Order Denying Motion and second copy of #81 Report and Recommendations sent to Barnes via regular mail and via CMRRR 7013 1710 0001 9920 5279. (klw)
July 9, 2015 Filing 91 MOTION to Enter Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Carolyn Barnes. (os)
July 6, 2015 Filing 90 AMENDED NOTICE by Carolyn Barnes re #89 Notice to the Court. (td)
July 6, 2015 Filing 89 NOTICE to the Court by Carolyn Barnes (td).
June 30, 2015 Filing 88 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by United States of America, re #86 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Barnes (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richter, Zachary)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DENYING #84 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
June 23, 2015 Filing 86 MOTION Challenging Standing of United States/Remand to State Court by Carolyn Barnes.. Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
June 23, 2015 Filing 85 SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT by Carolyn Barnes. (dm)
June 22, 2015 Filing 84 MOTION to Reconsider Denial of Plaintiff's Objections to Referral and Motion to Disqualify by Carolyn Barnes.. Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
June 15, 2015 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
June 15, 2015 Filing 83 Certified Mail Receipt of #81 Report and Recommendations. (td)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDERED that Barnes IMMEDIATELY SERVE Defendants Loftin and Poppa. Barnes is hereby WARNED that if she fails to serve Defendants Loftin and Poppa by August 17, 2015, and fails to show good cause for such failure, this Court will recommend that the District Court DISMISS the above-styled action against Defendants Loftin and Poppa for failure to timely serve. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td) Modified on 6/16/2015 to correct presiding judge (td).
June 15, 2015 Filing 81 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by United States of America, Kathleen Gittel. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER DENYING #78 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DENYING #77 Motion to Disqualify. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
June 8, 2015 Filing 78 MOTION for Reconsideration re #75 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Carolyn Barnes.. Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
June 5, 2015 Filing 77 Objection to #59 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge by Carolyn Barnes. (td)
June 5, 2015 Filing 76 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Carolyn Barnes re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant United States of America, Defendant Kathleen Gittel. (td)
June 5, 2015 MOTION to Disqualify (contained within doc #77 ) by Carolyn Barnes. Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Dkt. No. #32 ) is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that all of Barnes' claims against defendants other than Kathleen Gittel, Harold Poppa, and Lacey Loftin be SEVERED from this case, and REMANDED to the 419th Judicial District Court for Travis County Texas. The sole claims remaining shall be those against Kathleen Gittel, Harold Poppa, and Lacey Loftin. FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions other than the government's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Dkt No. #4 ) are DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
June 4, 2015 Remark : Certain claims severed to 1:15-cv-483-RP. (afd)
June 2, 2015 Filing 74 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim for Relief, or Alternatively, For More Definite Statement and Continuing Motion to Abate by Carolyn Barnes.. Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
June 2, 2015 Filing 73 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #57 MOTION to Dismiss Television Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Chapter 27 of the Texas Civil Practice & Remedies Code and Statute of Limitations Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Carolyn Barnes. and Continuing Motion to Abate. Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
June 2, 2015 Filing 72 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #64 MOTION to Dismiss and Continuing Motion to Abate by Carolyn Barnes.. Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
June 2, 2015 Filing 71 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State A Claim, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dusty Humes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (Rowe, Brett)
June 2, 2015 Filing 70 RESPONSE to #62 Notice of Filing by Kathleen Gittel, United States of America. (Richter, Zachary)
June 2, 2015 Filing 69 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Kathleen Gittel, re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant United States of America, Defendant Kathleen Gittel (Richter, Zachary)
June 1, 2015 Filing 68 NOTICE of Vacation for David Davis by Richard Coons (Davis, David)
May 29, 2015 Filing 67 NOTICE Vacation Letter for Catherine Robb by Jim Bergamo, Erin Cargile, KEYE, KVUE-TV, KXAN Austin News, Noelle Newton (Prather, Laura)
May 29, 2015 Filing 66 NOTICE Vacation Letter for Laura Lee Prather by Jim Bergamo, Erin Cargile, KEYE, KVUE-TV, KXAN Austin News, Noelle Newton (Prather, Laura)
May 26, 2015 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Irma Guerrero, Deborah Klekar, Robert Lerma, Ron Morgan, Bill Swaim, Dennis G. Tumlinson, re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim TRAVIS COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PURSUANT TO RULE 12(c) filed by Defendant Ron Morgan, Defendant Irma Guerrero, Defendant Bill Swaim, Defendant Deborah Klekar, Defendant Robert Lerma, Defendant Dennis G. Tumlinson (Eiserloh, Laurie)
May 26, 2015 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss by Austin American Statesman, Austin Legal Blog, Zach Ryall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - J, #2 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (Hemphill, James)
May 26, 2015 Filing 63 Objections, MOTION to Sever and Remand by Carolyn Barnes. Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
May 26, 2015 Filing 62 NOTICE of Filing Memorandum to the Court Concerning Lack of Due Process and Equal Proection Under the Law in Federal Court by Carolyn Barnes. (td)
May 26, 2015 Filing 61 PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF in Support of Responses to Motions to Dismiss #47 , #48 , #49 , #50 , #56 by Carolyn Barnes. (td)
May 26, 2015 Filing 60 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Carolyn Barnes, re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant United States of America, Defendant Kathleen Gittel. (td)
May 26, 2015 RESPONSE to Motion (contained within document #63 ), filed by Carolyn Barnes, re #51 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Michelle Borynski, Defendant Supreme Court of Texas, Defendant Kirk Cole, Defendant Gail Johnson, Defendant Third Court of Appeals. (td)
May 22, 2015 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin. Referral Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td)
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td)
May 21, 2015 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss by Alan Schreiber. (td)
May 21, 2015 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss Television Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Chapter 27 of the Texas Civil Practice & Remedies Code and Statute of Limitations, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jim Bergamo, Erin Cargile, KEYE, KVUE-TV, KXAN Austin News, Noelle Newton. (Prather, Laura)
May 21, 2015 Filing 56 AMENDED OBJECTIONS, AMENDED MOTION to Sever and Remand amending #50 by Carolyn Barnes. (td)
May 21, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE of Filing Memorandum to the Court Concerning Constitutional Claims by Carolyn Barnes. (td)
May 21, 2015 Filing 54 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Kathleen Gittel, United States of America, re #43 MOTION to Strike filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Barnes, #34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement, #17 MOTION to Dismiss Un MOTION to Stay re #26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement, #17 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule 12(b)(6), #28 M filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Barnes, #35 MOTION for Hearing filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Barnes, #32 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Carolyn Barnes (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richter, Zachary)
May 21, 2015 AMENDED RESPONSE (contained within doc #56 ) to Motion amending #50 , filed by Carolyn Barnes, re #26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant John Foster, #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Suzanne Brooks, #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Donna Tiemann Connell, #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Teresa Hall, #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Lisa David, #25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant John Bradley (td)
May 20, 2015 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michelle Borynski, Kirk Cole, Gail Johnson, Supreme Court of Texas, Third Court of Appeals CORRECTED #51 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) (Anastasiadis, Demetri)
May 20, 2015 Filing 52 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #51 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) (jk)
May 19, 2015 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Michelle Borynski, Kirk Cole, Gail Johnson, Supreme Court of Texas, Third Court of Appeals. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anastasiadis, Demetri)
May 18, 2015 Filing 50 Objections, MOTION to Sever and Remand by Carolyn Barnes. (td).
May 18, 2015 Filing 49 Objections, MOTION to Sever and Remand by Carolyn Barnes. (td)
May 18, 2015 Filing 48 Objections, MOTION to Sever and Remand by Carolyn Barnes. (td)
May 18, 2015 Filing 47 Objections, MOTION to Sever and Remand by Carolyn Barnes. (td)
May 18, 2015 RESPONSE to Motion (contained within doc #47 ), filed by Carolyn Barnes, re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Elizabeth Cunningham, Defendant Burt Carnes, Defendant John Delaney, Defendant Ken Paxton, Defendant Guilford Jones, Defendant Marty Griffith (td)
May 18, 2015 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Carolyn Barnes (contained within doc #49 ), re #20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Linda Acevedo, Defendant Judith Gres Deberry. (td)
May 18, 2015 RESPONSE to Motion (contained within doc #48 , filed by Carolyn Barnes, re #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim TRAVIS COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PURSUANT TO RULE 12(c) filed by Defendant Ron Morgan, Defendant Irma Guerrero, Defendant Bill Swaim, Defendant Deborah Klekar, Defendant Robert Lerma, Defendant Dennis G. Tumlinson (td)
May 18, 2015 RESPONSE to Motion (contained within doc #50 ), filed by Carolyn Barnes, re #26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant John Foster, #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Suzanne Brooks, #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Donna Tiemann Connell, #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Teresa Hall, #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Lisa David, #25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant John Bradley. (td)
May 15, 2015 Filing 46 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Scott Burn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Swete, Susan)
May 15, 2015 Filing 45 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Nick Richter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Prejean, Henry)
May 15, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry W. Prejean on behalf of Nick Richter. Attorney Henry W. Prejean added to party Nick Richter(pty:dft) (Prejean, Henry)
May 14, 2015 Filing 43 Motion to Strike by Carolyn Barnes re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim by Kathleen Gittel, United States of America.(klw) (Clerk notes plaintiff had another person bring this pleading in for filing. Filer acknowledged that the document is deficient at is lacks an original signature.) Modified on 5/21/2015 (td).
May 14, 2015 Filing 42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lloyd Doug Shaver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Prejean, Henry)
May 14, 2015 Filing 41 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Melissa Hightower. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Prejean, Henry)
May 14, 2015 Filing 40 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dale Rye. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Prejean, Henry)
May 14, 2015 Filing 39 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Dee Hobbs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Prejean, Henry)
May 14, 2015 Filing 38 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Belinda Bartz, Paul Bogan, Jereme Brinkmann, Robert Chapman, Robert Gremillion, Pete Hughey, Paul Jordan, Robert Kee, Robert Newell, David Ruppart, Storey Sherouse, Russell Travis, Doug Waggoner, Richard de la Vega. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Prejean, Henry)
May 14, 2015 Filing 37 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Robert McCabe, Travis McDonald, Geoffrey Puryear, Josh Reno. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Prejean, Henry)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants' responses are due on or before May 26, 2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lh)
May 13, 2015 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motions by Kathleen Gittel, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richter, Zachary)
May 11, 2015 Filing 35 MOTION for Show Cause Hearing, by Carolyn Barnes. (jk)
May 11, 2015 Filing 34 MOTION to Stay, or in the alternative, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Carolyn Barnes as to #26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement, #17 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule 12(b)(6), #28 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim for Relief, or Alternatively, For More Definite Statement, #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim TRAVIS COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PURSUANT TO RULE 12(c), #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement, #20 MOTION to Dismiss , #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for More Definite Statement, #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (jk)
May 11, 2015 Filing 33 Memorandum in Support of #32 Objections to Notice of Removal and MOTION to Remand to State Court, by Carolyn Barnes. (jk)
May 11, 2015 Filing 32 Objections to Notice of Removal and MOTION to Remand to State Court by Carolyn Barnes. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support)(jk)
May 11, 2015 Filing 31 NOTICE of representing self pro se, by Todd Dudley. (jk)
May 11, 2015 Filing 30 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by KXAN Austin News. (Prather, Laura)
May 11, 2015 Filing 29 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by KEYE. (Prather, Laura)
May 5, 2015 Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim for Relief, or Alternatively, For More Definite Statement by Richard Coons. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Davis, David)
May 4, 2015 Filing 27 NOTICE of representing self pro se, by Alan Schreiber. (jk)
May 4, 2015 Filing 26 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by John Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Prejean, Henry)
May 4, 2015 Filing 25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by John Bradley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Prejean, Henry)
May 1, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Service Dkt #21 by Irma Guerrero, Deborah Klekar, Robert Lerma, Ron Morgan, Bill Swaim, Dennis G. Tumlinson (Williams, Andrew)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #23 Motion to Substitute Attorney. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lh)
April 29, 2015 Filing 23 MOTION to Substitute Attorney as Lead Counsel and Attorney in Charge by Michelle Borynski, Burt Carnes, Kirk Cole, Elizabeth Cunningham, John Delaney, Marty Griffith, Gail Johnson, Guilford Jones, Ken Paxton, Supreme Court of Texas, Third Court of Appeals. (Anastasiadis, Demetri)
April 29, 2015 Filing 22 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Andrew M. Williams: re #21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . (td)
April 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lh)
April 28, 2015 Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Irma Guerrero, Deborah Klekar, Robert Lerma, Ron Morgan, Bill Swaim, Dennis G. Tumlinson. (Williams, Andrew)
April 28, 2015 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by Linda Acevedo, Judith Gres Deberry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Homburg, Paul)
April 28, 2015 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Catherine Lewis Robb on behalf of Jim Bergamo, Erin Cargile, KEYE, KVUE-TV, KXAN Austin News, Noelle Newton (Robb, Catherine)
April 28, 2015 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura Lee Prather on behalf of Jim Bergamo, Erin Cargile, KEYE, KVUE-TV, KXAN Austin News, Noelle Newton (Prather, Laura)
April 27, 2015 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) by Burt Carnes, Elizabeth Cunningham, John Delaney, Marty Griffith, Guilford Jones, Ken Paxton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anastasiadis, Demetri)
April 27, 2015 Filing 16 Letter/Correspondence to Alan Schreiber re: non-admitted status. (td)
April 27, 2015 Filing 15 Letter/Correspondence to Todd S. Dudley re: non-admitted status. (td)
April 27, 2015 Filing 14 Letter/Correspondence to Barton Vana re: non-admitted status. (td)
April 27, 2015 Filing 13 Letter/Correspondence to Richard D. Davis re: non-admitted status. (td)
April 27, 2015 Filing 12 Letter/Correspondence to Judith Gres DeBerry re: non-admitted status. (td)
April 27, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul H. Homburg, III on behalf of Linda Acevedo, Judith Gres Deberry. Attorney Paul H. Homburg, III added to party Linda Acevedo(pty:dft), Attorney Paul H. Homburg, III added to party Judith Gres Deberry(pty:dft) (Homburg, Paul)
April 24, 2015 Filing 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Donna Tiemann Connell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Prejean, Henry)
April 24, 2015 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Teresa Hall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Prejean, Henry). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 4/27/2015 (td).
April 24, 2015 Filing 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim TRAVIS COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6), OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PURSUANT TO RULE 12(c) by Irma Guerrero, Deborah Klekar, Robert Lerma, Ron Morgan, Bill Swaim, Dennis G. Tumlinson. (Eiserloh, Laurie)
April 24, 2015 Filing 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Lisa David. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Prejean, Henry). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 4/27/2015 (td).
April 24, 2015 Filing 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Suzanne Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Prejean, Henry). Added MOTION for More Definite Statement on 4/27/2015 (td).
April 24, 2015 Filing 5 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Supplement State Docket pp. 1-20, #2 Supplement State Docket pp. 21-39, #3 Supplement State Docket pp. 40-59, #4 Supplement State Docket pp. 60-79, #5 Supplement State Docket pp. 80-99, #6 Supplement State Docket pp. 100-121, #7 Supplement State Docket pp. 122-141, #8 Supplement State Docket pp. 142-178, #9 Supplement State Docket pp. 179-203)(Richter, Zachary)
April 24, 2015 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kathleen Gittel, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Census Incident Report, #2 Exhibit B - Indictment, #3 Exhibit C - Judgment of Conviction & Sentence, #4 Exhibit D - Henson Declaration)(Richter, Zachary)
April 22, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James A. Hemphill on behalf of Austin American Statesman, Austin Legal Blog, Zach Ryall. Attorney James A. Hemphill added to party Austin American Statesman(pty:dft), Attorney James A. Hemphill added to party Austin Legal Blog(pty:dft), Attorney James A. Hemphill added to party Zach Ryall(pty:dft) (Hemphill, James)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (afd)
April 17, 2015 Case Assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
April 17, 2015 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Carolyn Barnes. (afd)
April 17, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kathleen Gittel, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Filing fee $400), filed by Kathleen Gittel, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1a - Citation & Petition pp. 1-50, #2 Exhibit 1b - Petition pp. 51-end, #3 Exhibit 2 - Certification of Scope of Employment, #4 Exhibit 3 - Notice to State Court of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplement)(Richter, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa David
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Richter
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Hughey
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Cargile
Represented By: Catherine Lewis Robb
Represented By: Laura Lee Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Doug Shaver
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zach Ryall
Represented By: James A. Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Reno
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Another That Knows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Acevedo
Represented By: Paul H. Homburg, III
Represented By: Stephanie Terese Strolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey Puryear
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Hightower
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Gres Deberry
Represented By: Paul H. Homburg, III
Represented By: Stephanie Terese Strolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee Hobbs
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis McDonald
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gremillion
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Poppa
Represented By: Zachary Carl Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Bergamo
Represented By: Catherine Lewis Robb
Represented By: Laura Lee Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One That Knows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Travis
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Newell
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kee
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Legal Blog
Represented By: James A. Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Jordan
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Rye
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jereme Brinkmann
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Brooks
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberals R. Clueless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Cole
Represented By: Christin Cobe Vasquez
Represented By: Yvonne D. Bennett
Represented By: Demetri Anastasiadis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Gittel
Represented By: Zachary Carl Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Scheffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Delaney
Represented By: Christin Cobe Vasquez
Represented By: Yvonne D. Bennett
Represented By: Demetri Anastasiadis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRPBEAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Cotton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Third Court of Appeals
Represented By: Christin Cobe Vasquez
Represented By: Yvonne D. Bennett
Represented By: Demetri Anastasiadis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacey Loftin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guilford Jones
Represented By: Christin Cobe Vasquez
Represented By: Demetri Anastasiadis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Cunningham
Represented By: Christin Cobe Vasquez
Represented By: Yvonne D. Bennett
Represented By: Demetri Anastasiadis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVUE-TV
Represented By: Catherine Lewis Robb
Represented By: Laura Lee Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin American Statesman
Represented By: James A. Hemphill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Tiemann Connell
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Klekar
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Laurie R. Eiserloh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Chapman
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Bogan
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Coons
Represented By: David M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Swaim
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Andrew M. Williams
Represented By: Patrick M. Kelly
Represented By: Laurie R. Eiserloh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEYE
Represented By: Catherine Lewis Robb
Represented By: Laura Lee Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dusty Humes
Represented By: Brett B. Rowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irma Guerrero
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Andrew M. Williams
Represented By: Patrick M. Kelly
Represented By: Laurie R. Eiserloh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Paxton
Represented By: Christin Cobe Vasquez
Represented By: Yvonne D. Bennett
Represented By: Demetri Anastasiadis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Waggoner
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Morgan
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Andrew M. Williams
Represented By: Patrick M. Kelly
Represented By: Laurie R. Eiserloh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noelle Newton
Represented By: Catherine Lewis Robb
Represented By: Laura Lee Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nativeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ruppart
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Storey Sherouse
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anonymous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard de la Vega
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KXAN Austin News
Represented By: Catherine Lewis Robb
Represented By: Laura Lee Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supreme Court of Texas
Represented By: Christin Cobe Vasquez
Represented By: Yvonne D. Bennett
Represented By: Demetri Anastasiadis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Hall
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis G. Tumlinson
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Andrew M. Williams
Represented By: Patrick M. Kelly
Represented By: Laurie R. Eiserloh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Griffith
Represented By: Christin Cobe Vasquez
Represented By: Yvonne D. Bennett
Represented By: Demetri Anastasiadis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lerma
Represented By: Anthony J. Nelson
Represented By: Laurie R. Eiserloh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Borynski
Represented By: Christin Cobe Vasquez
Represented By: Yvonne D. Bennett
Represented By: Demetri Anastasiadis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burt Carnes
Represented By: Christin Cobe Vasquez
Represented By: Yvonne D. Bennett
Represented By: Demetri Anastasiadis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Johnson
Represented By: Christin Cobe Vasquez
Represented By: Yvonne D. Bennett
Represented By: Demetri Anastasiadis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Burn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda Bartz
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert McCabe
Represented By: Henry W. Prejean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Zachary Carl Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?