Defense Distributed et al v. United States Department of State et al
Plaintiff: Defense Distributed and Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Department of State, Secretary of State John F. Kerry, Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Deputy Asst. Secy. Kenneth B. Handelman, Director C. Edward Peartree, Division Chief Sarah J. Heidema, Senior Advisor Glenn Smith, United States Department of State and Kenneth B. Handelman
Petitioner: Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, Inc., Giffords and The Brady Campaign to Prevent Gun Violence
Case Number: 1:2015cv00372
Filed: May 6, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #121 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' motion to alter or amend judgment is extended to and includes September 12, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as)
August 30, 2018 Filing 121 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #117 MOTION to Amend Judgment under Rule 59 or, alternatively, Rule 60 by Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, John F. Kerry, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith, United States Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Stuart)
August 28, 2018 Filing 120 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defense Distributed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacks, W.)
August 28, 2018 Filing 119 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defense Distributed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morris, David)
August 28, 2018 Filing 118 PLEASE DISREGARD - NO PROPOSED ORDER NEEDED FOR DISPOSITIVE MOTION FILED DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #117 MOTION to Amend Judgment under Rule 59 or, alternatively, Rule 60 (dl) Modified on 8/28/2018 to correct deficiency notice issued in error (dl).
August 27, 2018 Filing 117 MOTION to Amend Judgment under Rule 59 or, alternatively, Rule 60 by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Raffetto, Mary)
August 27, 2018 Filing 116 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mary Kathryn Raffetto for Daniel N. Hammond ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11165829) by on behalf of Defense Distributed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to Daniel N. Hammond Pro Hac Vice)(Raffetto, Mary)
August 27, 2018 Filing 115 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mary Kathryn Raffetto for Charles R. Flores ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11164953) by on behalf of Defense Distributed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to Charles R. Fores Motion for Admission)(Raffetto, Mary)
August 27, 2018 Filing 114 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary Kathryn Raffetto on behalf of Defense Distributed. Attorney Mary Kathryn Raffetto added to party Defense Distributed(pty:pla) (Raffetto, Mary)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER that the case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
July 27, 2018 Filing 112 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, John F. Kerry, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith, United States Department of State. (Robinson, Stuart)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER DENYING #96 Motion to Intervene; DENYING #97 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
July 27, 2018 Filing 110 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Motion Hearing held on 7/27/2018 re #96 MOTION to Intervene filed by Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, Inc., The Brady Campaign to Prevent Gun Violence, Giffords, #97 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, Inc., The Brady Campaign to Prevent Gun Violence, Giffords (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(dl)
July 27, 2018 Filing 109 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to #96 MOTION to Intervene by Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, Inc., Giffords, The Brady Campaign to Prevent Gun Violence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D_Letter LA City Attorney)(Cabello, J.)
July 27, 2018 Filing 108 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Defense Distributed, re #97 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Movant Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, Inc., Movant The Brady Campaign to Prevent Gun Violence, Movant Giffords (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gura, Alan)
July 27, 2018 Filing 107 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Defense Distributed, re #96 MOTION to Intervene filed by Movant Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, Inc., Movant The Brady Campaign to Prevent Gun Violence, Movant Giffords (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Gura, Alan)
July 27, 2018 Filing 106 MOTION to Strike #96 MOTION to Intervene, #103 Supplemental Memorandum, (PART B OF SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE AND SPECIFIC PARAGRAPHS OF DECLARATIONS OF NICHOLAS SUPLINA, ALISON DAMASKOS, AND JOSHUA SCHARFF) by Defense Distributed. (Gura, Alan)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING #102 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
July 27, 2018 Filing 103 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to #96 MOTION to Intervene by Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, Inc., Giffords, The Brady Campaign to Prevent Gun Violence. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Everytown Declaration, #2 Exhibit Giffords Declaration, #3 Exhibit Brady Declaration)(Cabello, J.)
July 26, 2018 Filing 105 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 7/26/2018. Minute entry documents are not available electronically. (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola) (dl)
July 26, 2018 Filing 102 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. David Cabello [John D. Kimball-Blank Rome LLP], ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11053020) by on behalf of Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, Inc., Giffords, The Brady Campaign to Prevent Gun Violence. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Motion Pro Hac Vice)(Cabello, J.) (Main Document 102 replaced on 7/26/2018) (ep).
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Setting Telephonic Hearing on #98 MOTION for Hearing re #97 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #96 MOTION to Intervene, #97 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2018 at 02:30 PM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
July 26, 2018 Filing 100 Letter/Correspondence to John D. Kimball re: non-admitted status. (klw)
July 25, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. David Cabello on behalf of The Brady Campaign to Prevent Gun Violence, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, Inc. Giffords. Attorney J. David Cabello added to party The Brady Campaign to Prevent Gun Violence(pty:mvt), Attorney J. David Cabello added to party Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, Inc.(pty:mvt), Attorney J. David Cabello added to party Giffords(pty:mvt) (Cabello, J.) Modified on 7/26/2018 to correct filers and docket text (klw).
July 25, 2018 Filing 98 MOTION for Emergency Hearing re #97 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by The Brady Campaign to Prevent Gun Violence, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, Inc. Giffords. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Hearing)(Cabello, J.) Modified on 7/26/2018 to correct filing parties (klw).
July 25, 2018 Filing 97 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by The Brady Campaign to Prevent Gun Violence, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, Inc. Giffords.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order granting Emergency Motion for TRO)(Cabello, J.) Modified on 7/26/2018 to correct filing parties (klw).
July 25, 2018 Filing 96 JOINT EMERGENCY MOTION for Leave to Intervenors by The Brady Campaign to Prevent Gun Violence, Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, Inc. Giffords. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Memo of Law, #2 Exhibit B_Complaint, #3 Exhibit C_ Settlement Agreement, #4 Proposed Order granting Motion Leave file Intervention, #5 Appendix)(Cabello, J.) Modified on 7/26/2018 (jg3). Modified on 7/26/2018 to correct filers and document text (klw).
June 28, 2018 Filing 95 STATUS REPORT by Defense Distributed. (Goldstein, Matthew)
June 28, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew A. Goldstein (Goldstein, Matthew)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #93 Motion to Stay Case entered by Judge Robert Pitman. It is ORDERED that the parties file a report on the status of settlement within 60 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as)
April 30, 2018 Filing 93 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Matthew)
April 6, 2018 Filing 92 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, United States Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Soskin, Eric)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #91 Motion to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs written offer of settlement on or before April 13, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as)
March 28, 2018 Filing 91 Consent MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Only as to Response to Written Offer of Settlement by Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, United States Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric)
March 16, 2018 Filing 90 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah J. Heidema, Mike Miller, United States Department of State amending #47 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc..(dl)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #89 Motion to Amend Complaint entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as)
March 15, 2018 Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION to Amend Complaint by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Second Amended Complaint), #2 Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Matthew)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/30/2018 and Joinder of Parties due by 3/30/2018. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
March 8, 2018 Filing 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Pretrial Conference held on 3/8/2018 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(dl)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER RESETTING Initial Pretrial Conference to 3/8/2018 at 09:40 AM by phone before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER RESETTING Pretrial Conference to 3/8/2018 at 09:10 AM by phone with Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
February 16, 2018 Filing 84 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, John F. Kerry, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith, United States Department of State. (Robinson, Stuart)
February 16, 2018 Filing 83 Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2018 at 09:00 AM (by phone) before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
February 16, 2018 Filing 82 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Gura, Alan)
February 9, 2018 Filing 81 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Gura, Alan)
February 2, 2018 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #79 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Parties are instructed to resubmit the proposed scheduling order using the proper form, which can be found at www.txwd.uscourts.gov under standing orders for Judge Pitman.(jg3)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER that Plaintiffs claims against Kenneth B. Handelman, C. Edward Peartree, Sarah J. Heidema, and Glenn Smith, in their individual capacities only, are dismissed pursuant to #78 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Defense Distributed. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw)
January 31, 2018 Filing 79 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Lodged Second Amended Complaint)(Gura, Alan)
January 31, 2018 Filing 78 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. (Gura, Alan)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER lifting stay. ORDER re-opening case. ORDER for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 1/31/2018. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw)
January 9, 2018 Filing 76 WRIT OF CERTIORARI re Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory, DENIED by US Supreme Court. (klw)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DENYING #70 Motion to Stay; GRANTING #73 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jf)
April 26, 2017 Filing 74 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith, re #73 MOTION to Strike #72 Response to Motion, "Individual Capacity" Defendants' Request to Lift Stay filed by Plaintiff Defense Distributed (Fuchs, Siegmund)
April 26, 2017 Filing 73 MOTION to Strike #72 Response to Motion, "Individual Capacity" Defendants' Request to Lift Stay by Defense Distributed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Form of Order / Striking, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Form of Order / Leave)(Goldstein, Matthew)
April 25, 2017 Filing 72 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith, re #70 MOTION to Stay Deadlines as to Official Capacity Defendants, Pending Certiorari Proceedings filed by Defendant Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Defendant United States Department of State (Fuchs, Siegmund)
April 24, 2017 Filing 71 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Defense Distributed, re #70 MOTION to Stay Deadlines as to Official Capacity Defendants, Pending Certiorari Proceedings filed by Defendant Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Defendant United States Department of State (Goldstein, Matthew)
April 20, 2017 Filing 70 MOTION to Stay Deadlines as to Official Capacity Defendants, Pending Certiorari Proceedings by Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, United States Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric)
April 11, 2017 Filing 69 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Siegmund Fred Fuchs on behalf of Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith. Attorney Siegmund Fred Fuchs added to party Kenneth B. Handelman(pty:dft), Attorney Siegmund Fred Fuchs added to party Sarah J. Heidema(pty:dft), Attorney Siegmund Fred Fuchs added to party C. Edward Peartree(pty:dft), Attorney Siegmund Fred Fuchs added to party Glenn Smith(pty:dft) (Fuchs, Siegmund)
April 4, 2017 Filing 68 Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE Affirming #45 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Defense Distributed. (jf)
December 4, 2015 Certification of the Electronic Supplemental Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory,,. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (os)
November 5, 2015 Filing 67 Copy of ORDER of USCA regarding Sealed Documents ; re Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory. (os)
October 16, 2015 Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory,,. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (os)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING #63 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal is hereby GRANTED and the above-styled action is ordered STAYED during the pendency of Plaintiffs interlocutory appeal. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (os)
October 1, 2015 Case Stayed pursuant to #66 Order. (os)
September 29, 2015 Filing 65 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, John F. Kerry, United States Department of State, re #63 MOTION to Stay Case filed by Plaintiff Defense Distributed (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric)
September 29, 2015 Filing 64 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith, re #63 MOTION to Stay Case filed by Plaintiff Defense Distributed (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richter, Zachary)
September 22, 2015 Filing 63 MOTION to Stay Case by Defense Distributed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Goldstein, Matthew)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #62 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Any reply the Individual Defendants wish to file in support of their motion to dismiss shall be be filed on or before November 20, 2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aemp)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #60 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aemp)
September 14, 2015 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richter, Zachary)
September 14, 2015 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss by Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A (Ex. 6 to Pls.' Mot. for Prelim. Inj.), #2 Attachment B (Ex. 7 to Pls.' Mot. for Prelim. Inj.), #3 Attachment C (Ex. 9 to Pls.' Mot. for Prelim. Inj.))(Richter, Zachary)
September 14, 2015 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richter, Zachary)
September 9, 2015 Filing 59 NOTICE (Vacation Letter) by Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith (Richter, Zachary)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AMENDED ORDER re #56 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. The Individual Defendants responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint is due on or before September 14, 2015. Any response Plaintiffs deem necessary to that pleading is due on or before October 16, 2015. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (os)
September 2, 2015 Filing 57 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. for dates of 7/6/15. Proceedings Transcribed: Preliminary Injuction Hearing. Court Reporter: Joe Reynosa. (os)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING #53 Motion for Extension of Time to to Respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. The Individual Defendants responsive pleading to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint is due on or before September 8, 2015. Any response Plaintiffs deem necessary to that pleading is due on or before October 16, 2015. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (os)
September 2, 2015 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith, re #53 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response To Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Kenneth B. Handelman, Defendant Glenn Smith, Defendant Sarah J. Heidema, Defendant C. Edward Peartree (Richter, Zachary)
September 1, 2015 Filing 54 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., re #53 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response To Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Kenneth B. Handelman, Defendant Glenn Smith, Defendant Sarah J. Heidema, Defendant C. Edward Peartree (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Gura, Alan)
September 1, 2015 Filing 53 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response To Amended Complaint by Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richter, Zachary)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING #51 Motion to Set Time for U.S. Government Defendants to Answer First Amended Complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that the U.S. Government Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, ECF No. 47, no later than 21 days after a mandate issues from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit on Plaintiffs' pending interlocutory appeal. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (os)
August 31, 2015 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION For Order Setting Time For The U.S. Government Defendants To Answer Or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah J. Heidema, John F. Kerry, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith, United States Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric)
August 31, 2015 Filing 50 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on July 6, 2015, Proceedings Transcribed: Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Joe Reynosa, Telephone number: 210-244-5038. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 9/21/2015, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/1/2015, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2015, Appeal Record due by 9/15/2015, (Reynosa, Joe)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DISMISSING without Prejudice Defendants' #46 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw)
August 21, 2015 Filing 47 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending #1 Complaint., filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc..(Gura, Alan)
August 14, 2015 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss by Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith. (jk)
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #44 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aemp)
August 13, 2015 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #43 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: #45 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0542-7697637. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out #Form DKT-13 (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (jk)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Appeal of Order entered by District Judge #43 by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc..denying motion for preliminary injunction ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0542-7697637) (Gura, Alan)
August 13, 2015 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Individual Defendants' Motion To Dismiss)(Richter, Zachary)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING #7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
July 14, 2015 Filing 42 NOTICE RE: GOVERNMENT'S STANDING CLAIMS by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. (Mateja, William)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #41 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants' answer or responsive pleading is due within twenty-one days of the Court's ruling on Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injuunction. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aemp)
July 13, 2015 Filing 41 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, John F. Kerry, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith, United States Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric)
July 7, 2015 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Michael Blackman on behalf of Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Attorney Joshua Michael Blackman added to party Defense Distributed(pty:pla), Attorney Joshua Michael Blackman added to party Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.(pty:pla) (Blackman, Joshua)
July 6, 2015 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Motion Hearing held on 7/6/2015 re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Defense Distributed (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Joe Reynosa.)(dm)
July 3, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE Regarding Under Seal Filing by United States Department of State (Soskin, Eric)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #36 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aemp)
June 24, 2015 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Plaintiff Defense Distributed MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - slipsheet for Sealed Exhibit, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Mateja, William)
June 24, 2015 Filing 36 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-Supplemental Declaration of Cody Wilson) (Mateja, William)
June 22, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachary Carl Richter on behalf of Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith. Attorney Zachary Carl Richter added to party Kenneth B. Handelman(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Carl Richter added to party Sarah J. Heidema(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Carl Richter added to party C. Edward Peartree(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Carl Richter added to party Glenn Smith(pty:dft) (Richter, Zachary)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #34 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
June 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #33 Motion for Leave for Counsel for Plaintiffs to Appear Telephonically at Preliminary Injunction Hearing entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aemp)
June 17, 2015 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation FOR PLAINTIFFS' BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mateja, William)
June 17, 2015 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Leave for Counsel to Appear Telephonically at Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mateja, William)
June 10, 2015 Filing 32 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, John F. Kerry, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith, United States Department of State, re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Plaintiff Defense Distributed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lisa Aguirre, #2 Proposed Order)(Soskin, Eric)
June 9, 2015 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric J. Soskin on behalf of Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, John F. Kerry, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith, United States Department of State (Soskin, Eric)
June 8, 2015 Filing 30 NOTICE RE: DEFENDANTS RECENT PROPOSED RULES by Defense Distributed re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Goldstein, Matthew)
June 8, 2015 Filing 29 NOTICE RE: COMMODITY JURISDICTION RULINGS by Defense Distributed re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Goldstein, Matthew)
June 5, 2015 Filing 28 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Gura, Alan)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
May 19, 2015 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, John F. Kerry, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith, United States Department of State CORRECTED #25 Deficiency Notice (Robinson, Stuart)
May 19, 2015 Filing 25 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #23 Notice of Appearance. (dm)
May 19, 2015 Filing 24 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (dm)
May 19, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stuart Justin Robinson on behalf of Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, John F. Kerry, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith, United States Department of State. Attorney Stuart Justin Robinson added to party Directorate of Defense Trade Controls(pty:dft), Attorney Stuart Justin Robinson added to party Kenneth B. Handelman(pty:dft), Attorney Stuart Justin Robinson added to party Sarah J. Heidema(pty:dft), Attorney Stuart Justin Robinson added to party John F. Kerry(pty:dft), Attorney Stuart Justin Robinson added to party C. Edward Peartree(pty:dft), Attorney Stuart Justin Robinson added to party Glenn Smith(pty:dft), Attorney Stuart Justin Robinson added to party United States Department of State(pty:dft) (Robinson, Stuart)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by atty Matthew Goldstein. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
May 18, 2015 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, John F. Kerry, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith, United States Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson, Stuart)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Setting Hearing on #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2015 09:30 AM before Judge Robert Pitman,. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
May 15, 2015 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Glenn Smith served on 5/14/2015, answer due 7/13/2015. (Mateja, William)
May 15, 2015 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. C. Edward Peartree served on 5/14/2015, answer due 7/13/2015. (Mateja, William)
May 15, 2015 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Sarah J. Heidema served on 5/14/2015, answer due 7/13/2015. (Mateja, William)
May 15, 2015 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Kenneth B. Handelman served on 5/14/2015, answer due 7/13/2015. (Mateja, William)
May 15, 2015 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. John F. Kerry served on 5/14/2015, answer due 7/13/2015. (Mateja, William)
May 15, 2015 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. United States Department of State served on 5/14/2015, answer due 7/13/2015. (Mateja, William)
May 15, 2015 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Directorate of Defense Trade Controls served on 5/14/2015, answer due 7/13/2015. (Mateja, William)
May 13, 2015 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William B. Mateja MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE - MATTHEW GOLDSTEIN ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7446350) by on behalf of Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Mateja, William)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alan Gura. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
May 12, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. re #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #6 Summons Issued as to USA, #1 Complaint, #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Mateja, William)
May 12, 2015 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William B. Mateja MOTION AND ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR ALAN GURA ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-7440640) by on behalf of Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Mateja, William)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aemp)
May 11, 2015 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation FOR THEIR BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mateja, William)
May 11, 2015 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support, filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Plaintiff Defense Distributed MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Attachments: #1 Appendix Part 1 of 6, #2 Appendix Part 2 of 6, #3 Appendix Part 3 of 6, #4 Appendix Part 4 of 6, #5 Appendix Part 5 of 6, #6 Appendix Part 6 of 6)(Mateja, William)
May 11, 2015 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mateja, William)
May 8, 2015 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Directorate of Defense Trade Controls, Kenneth B. Handelman, Sarah J. Heidema, John F. Kerry, C. Edward Peartree, Glenn Smith, United States Department of State.(dm)
May 7, 2015 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. OF U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, JOHN F. KERRY, DIRECTORATE OF DEFENSE TRADE CONTROLS, KENNETH B. HANDELMAN, C. EDWARD PEARTREE, SARAH J. HEIDEMA, AND GLENN SMITH (Mateja, William)
May 7, 2015 Filing 4 Letters to Alan Gura, Matthew Goldstein and Josh BLackman re: Non-Admitted Status. (afd)
May 6, 2015 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Mateja, William)
May 6, 2015 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defense Distributed. (Mateja, William)
May 6, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (1:15-cv-372) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7425618). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mateja, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Defense Distributed et al v. United States Department of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defense Distributed
Represented By: William B. Mateja
Represented By: Joshua Michael Blackman
Represented By: Alan Gura
Represented By: Matthew A. Goldstein
Represented By: David S. Morris
Represented By: W. Thomas Jacks
Represented By: Mary Kathryn Raffetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.
Represented By: William B. Mateja
Represented By: Joshua Michael Blackman
Represented By: Alan Gura
Represented By: David S. Morris
Represented By: W. Thomas Jacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State John F. Kerry
Represented By: Stuart Justin Robinson
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Directorate of Defense Trade Controls
Represented By: Stuart Justin Robinson
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Asst. Secy. Kenneth B. Handelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director C. Edward Peartree
Represented By: Stuart Justin Robinson
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Represented By: Zachary Carl Richter
Represented By: Siegmund Fred Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division Chief Sarah J. Heidema
Represented By: Stuart Justin Robinson
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Represented By: Zachary Carl Richter
Represented By: Siegmund Fred Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Advisor Glenn Smith
Represented By: Stuart Justin Robinson
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Represented By: Zachary Carl Richter
Represented By: Siegmund Fred Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Represented By: Stuart Justin Robinson
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth B. Handelman
Represented By: Stuart Justin Robinson
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Represented By: Zachary Carl Richter
Represented By: Siegmund Fred Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Everytown for Gun Safety Action Fund, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Kimball
Represented By: J. David Cabello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Giffords
Represented By: John D. Kimball
Represented By: J. David Cabello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Brady Campaign to Prevent Gun Violence
Represented By: John D. Kimball
Represented By: J. David Cabello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?