Garcia v. Professional Contract Services, Inc.

Plaintiff: Esteban Garcia
Defendant: Professional Contract Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00585
Filed: July 9, 2015
Court: Texas Western District Court
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3730 Civil Actions for False Claims
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 82 Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoenas. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
June 23, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 62 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
June 20, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 59 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal; GRANTING 60 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
January 17, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 37 Motion to Quash; DISMISSING AS MOOT 40 Motion to Expedite; DENYING 42 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (ml)
December 15, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 28 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Professional Contract Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esteban Garcia
Represented By: Gwen E. Bhella
Represented By: Brian A. Calhoun
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Feasby
Represented By: Michael J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Contract Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?