Firefly Systems, Inc. v. Markusic et al
Plaintiff: Firefly Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Markusic, Thomas E Markusic and Virgin Galactic, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00083
Filed: February 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Sam Sparks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DISMISSING, without prejudice to making the request in the arbitrationproceeding, Defendant Virgin Galactic, LLC's #65 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
June 16, 2016 Filing 68 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Firefly Systems, Inc., re #65 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Defendant Virgin Galactic, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Scott Humphreys, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit Exhibit CC)(Manning, Russell)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #66 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' #65 Opposed Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Deadline is extended to 06/16/16. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
May 24, 2016 Filing 66 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #65 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees by Firefly Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baird, Susan)
May 19, 2016 Filing 65 Opposed MOTION for Attorney Fees by Virgin Galactic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Evette Pennypacker, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C, #5 Exhibit Ex. D, #6 Exhibit Ex. E, #7 Exhibit Ex. F, #8 Exhibit Ex. G, #9 Exhibit Ex. H, #10 Exhibit Ex. I, #11 Exhibit Ex. J, #12 Exhibit Ex. K, #13 Exhibit Ex. L, #14 Exhibit Ex. M, #15 Exhibit Ex. N, #16 Exhibit Ex. O, #17 Exhibit Ex. P, #18 Exhibit Ex. Q, #19 Exhibit Ex. R, #20 Exhibit Ex. S, #21 Exhibit Ex. T, #22 Exhibit Ex. U, #23 Proposed Order)(Johns, Christopher)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice pursuant to #62 Notice of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
May 4, 2016 Filing 63 RESPONSE to #62 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Virgin Galactic, LLC. (Johns, Christopher)
April 28, 2016 Notice of Correction: re #62 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice. (Clerk notes the document has been modified to reflect that a NOTICE was filed instead of a MOTION as it was docketed.) (klw)
April 28, 2016 Filing 62 NOTICE of Dismiss with Prejudice by Firefly Systems, Inc. (Baird, Susan) Modified on 4/28/2016 to correct text (klw).
April 18, 2016 Filing 61 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on March 28, 2016, Proceedings Transcribed: Motion Hearing. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 5/9/2016, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2016, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2016, (Reznik, Lily)
April 15, 2016 Filing 60 SUPPLEMENT to #58 Supplement, #59 MOTION to Strike #58 Supplement by Firefly Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Manning, Russell)
April 15, 2016 Filing 59 MOTION to Strike #58 Supplement by Virgin Galactic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Los Angeles Superior Court Ruling, #2 Proposed Order)(Johns, Christopher)
April 14, 2016 Filing 58 SUPPLEMENT Submission by Firefly Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Baird, Susan)
April 6, 2016 Filing 57 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to William Johnson: re #56 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Virgin Galactic's Response and Objection to Plaintiff's Submission of Case Authority. This document is a motion for leave to file. Filer must include the document for the Courts review as a PDF attachment to the motion. The attachment shall not be filed as a separate document until the motion for leave to file is granted (page 6 item 4c, Administrative Policies and Procedures). Please re-file motion with attachment AND a proposed order. (klw)
April 6, 2016 Filing 56 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Virgin Galactic's Response and Objection to Plaintiff's Submission of Case Authority by Thomas E Markusic. (Johnson, William)
April 5, 2016 Filing 55 Miscellaneous Objection to #54 Response TO FIREFLYS SUBMISSION OF CASE AUTHORITY by Firefly Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Manning, Russell)
April 4, 2016 Filing 54 RESPONSE and Objection to #53 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Virgin Galactic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Johns, Christopher)
April 4, 2016 Filing 53 Memorandum in Support, filed by Firefly Systems, Inc., re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Firefly Systems, Inc. Submission of Case Authority Pursuant to the Court's Direction at March 28, 2016 Hearing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Baird, Susan)
April 1, 2016 Filing 52 Non-Opposition (RESPONSE in Support) and Joinder, filed by Firefly Systems, Inc, to #51 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Virgin Galactic, LLC (Baird, Susan) Modified on 4/1/2016 to modify text (klw).
March 31, 2016 Filing 51 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by Virgin Galactic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johns, Christopher)
March 28, 2016 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Motion Hearing held on 3/28/2016 re #43 Opposed MOTION for Hearing on Motion to Remand and Motion to Dismiss, #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court and #12 MOTION to Dismiss. Supplemental documents due re: jurisdiction. Written Order to follow. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(klw)
March 17, 2016 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Virgin Galactic, LLC, re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Virgin Galactic, LLC (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in support of Reply, #2 Declaration of Evette Pennypacker, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Johns, Christopher)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER, (All Pending Matters set for 3/28/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Sam Sparks,). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (ml)
March 12, 2016 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Virgin Galactic, LLC, re #43 Opposed MOTION for Hearing on Motion to Remand and Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Virgin Galactic, LLC (Johns, Christopher)
March 10, 2016 Filing 46 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Firefly Systems, Inc., re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Virgin Galactic, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Manning, Russell)
March 10, 2016 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Firefly Systems, Inc., re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Firefly Systems, Inc. (Manning, Russell)
March 10, 2016 Filing 44 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Firefly Systems, Inc., re #43 Opposed MOTION for Hearing on Motion to Remand and Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Virgin Galactic, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Manning, Russell)
March 8, 2016 Filing 43 Opposed MOTION for Hearing on Motion to Remand and Motion to Dismiss by Virgin Galactic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Virgin Galactic, LLC's Opposed Motion for Hearing on Motion to Remand and Motion to Dismiss)(Johns, Christopher)
March 7, 2016 Filing 42 Miscellaneous Objection to #40 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #41 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand by Firefly Systems, Inc.. (Manning, Russell)
March 3, 2016 Filing 41 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Virgin Galactic, LLC, re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Firefly Systems, Inc. (Johns, Christopher)
March 3, 2016 Filing 40 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Virgin Galactic, LLC, re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Firefly Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C, #5 Exhibit Ex. D, #6 Exhibit Ex. E, #7 Exhibit Ex. F, #8 Exhibit Ex. G, #9 Exhibit Ex. H, #10 Exhibit Ex. I, #11 Exhibit Ex. J, #12 Exhibit Ex. K, #13 Exhibit Ex. L, #14 Exhibit Ex. M, #15 Exhibit Ex. N, #16 Exhibit Ex. O)(Johns, Christopher)
March 3, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE to Court of Non-filing of Opposition to Motion to Remand by Firefly Systems, Inc. re #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Manning, Russell)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Russell Manning. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Sam Sparks. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldm)
February 26, 2016 Filing 38 Second MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Susan E. Baird ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8238989) by on behalf of Firefly Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baird, Susan)
February 25, 2016 Filing 37 Certified mail acknowledgment receipt for #13 Letter to Peter Haviland. (ml)
February 25, 2016 Filing 36 Certified mail acknowledgment receipt for #13 Letter to Scott Humphreys. (ml)
February 24, 2016 Filing 35 Certified Mail Receipt of #13 Second Notice sent to Russell Manning. (klw)
February 24, 2016 Filing 34 Certified Mail Receipt of #13 Second Notice sent to Steve Gordon. (klw)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #12 Motion to Dismiss until 03/10/16. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING Virgin Galactic, LLC's #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #17 Motion to Remand until 03/02/16. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
February 22, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan E. Baird on behalf of Firefly Systems, Inc. (Baird, Susan)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Virgin Galactic's #25 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in their Response to Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #16 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in their Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
February 22, 2016 Filing 28 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Virgin Galactic, LLC, re #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Firefly Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johns, Christopher)
February 19, 2016 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss by Firefly Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baird, Susan)
February 19, 2016 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Virgin Galactic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johns, Christopher)
February 19, 2016 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Response to Motion to Remand by Virgin Galactic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johns, Christopher)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion for Peter L. Haviland to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Steven Gordon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING #18 Motion for Russell Manning to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw)
February 18, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Vacation Letter by Thomas E Markusic (Johnson, William)
February 18, 2016 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Susan E. Baird for Peter Havilland ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8213976) by on behalf of Firefly Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baird, Susan)
February 18, 2016 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Susan E. Baird for Steven Gordon ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8213930) by on behalf of Firefly Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Gordon)(Baird, Susan)
February 18, 2016 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Susan E. Baird ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8213845) by on behalf of Firefly Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baird, Susan)
February 17, 2016 Filing 17 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Firefly Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baird, Susan)
February 17, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Firefly Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baird, Susan)
February 17, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Firefly Systems, Inc.. (Baird, Susan)
February 17, 2016 Filing 14 Copies of SECOND NOTICE Letters to Russell Manning, Steve Gordon, Peter Haviland and Scott Humphreys, counsel for Firefly, re: non-admitted status sent via CMRRR. (klw)
February 17, 2016 Filing 13 SECOND NOTICE Letters to Russell Manning, Steve Gordon, Peter Haviland and Scott Humphreys, counsel for Firefly, re: non-admitted status.(klw)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice William P. Johnson for Richard Volpe. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Sam Sparks. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldm)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William P. Johnson for Raipher D. Pellegrino. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Sam Sparks. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldm)
February 11, 2016 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Virgin Galactic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration ISO Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Proposed Order)(Johns, Christopher)
February 11, 2016 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William P. Johnson for Richard Volpe ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8196488) by on behalf of Thomas E Markusic. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, William)
February 11, 2016 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William P. Johnson for Raipher D. Pellegrino ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8196269) by on behalf of Thomas E Markusic. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, William)
February 11, 2016 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William P. Johnson on behalf of Thomas E Markusic. Attorney William P. Johnson added to party Thomas E Markusic(pty:dft) (Johnson, William)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Sam Sparks. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldm)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Sam Sparks. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldm)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Sam Sparks. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldm)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Sam Sparks. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ldm)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order for Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 4/1/2016. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (ml)
February 5, 2016 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher S. Johns on Behalf of Evette Pennypacker ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8177553) by on behalf of Virgin Galactic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johns, Christopher)
February 5, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher S. Johns on Behalf of Danielle Shrader-Frechette ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8177262) by on behalf of Virgin Galactic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johns, Christopher)
February 5, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher S. Johns on Behalf of Claude Stern ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8176697) by on behalf of Virgin Galactic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johns, Christopher)
February 5, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher S. Johns on Behalf of Patrick T. Schmidt ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-8176679) by on behalf of Virgin Galactic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johns, Christopher)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (so)
February 3, 2016 Filing 2 Letters to Russell Manning, Steve Gordon, Peter Haviland, and Scott S. Humphreys, counsel for Plantiff Firefly Systems, Inc. and David Burtt, counsel for Defendant Thomas E. Markusic re: non-admittance to Western District of Texas. (so)
February 1, 2016 Case Assigned to Judge Sam Sparks. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (so)
February 1, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Virgin Galactic, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-8160098), filed by Virgin Galactic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A1 (first part of state-court petition), #2 Exhibit Exhibit A2 (second part of state-court petition), #3 Exhibit Exhibit A3 (third part of state-court petition), #4 Exhibit Exhibit B (signed order on TRO), #5 Exhibit Exhibit C (state-court docket report), #6 Civil Cover Sheet Form JS-44 (civil cover sheet), #7 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Form JS-44, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Supplement to Form JS-44, #9 Exhibit Copy of Notice of Filing to Be Filed in State Court)(Johns, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firefly Systems, Inc. v. Markusic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firefly Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Peter L. Haviland
Represented By: Susan E. Baird
Represented By: Steven J. Gordon
Represented By: Russell Joe Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markusic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E Markusic
Represented By: Richard J. Volpe
Represented By: Raipher D. Pellegrino
Represented By: William P. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgin Galactic, LLC
Represented By: Christopher S. Johns
Represented By: Patrick T. Schmidt
Represented By: Claude M. Stern
Represented By: Evette Dionna Pennypacker
Represented By: Danielle Shrader-Frechette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?