Stockade Companies, LLC et al v. Kelly Restaurant Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Stockade Companies, LLC and Stockade Franchising, LP
Defendant: Kelly Restaurant Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv00143
Filed: February 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER DENYING 96 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dl)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DENYING Plaintiffs' Opposed 66 Motion to Compel and for Discovery Sanctions. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER DENYING 44 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jf)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DENYING Defendant's 51 Motion for Reconsideration. Defendant shall respond to all discovery requests, including requests for production, on or before 08/07/17. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (klw)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER MOOTING 36 Motion to Dismiss ; GRANTING 39 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jf)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING 28 Motion for Discovery; DENYING 31 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (ml)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING Kelly's Opposed 7 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (klw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stockade Companies, LLC et al v. Kelly Restaurant Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Restaurant Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stockade Companies, LLC
Represented By: Curtis J. Kurhajec
Represented By: Peter R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stockade Franchising, LP
Represented By: Curtis J. Kurhajec
Represented By: Peter R. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?