Echevarria v. Davol, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jessica Echevarria
Defendant: Davol, Inc. and C.R. Bard, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00599
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in Southern District of Ohio as case number 2:18-cv-01017. (lt)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 Conditional Transfer Order entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring case to the Southern District of Ohio. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel. (lt) Modified on 9/5/2018 (lt).
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Robert E. Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jessica Echevarria. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelsey Louise Stokes for Robert E. Price ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11057270) by on behalf of Jessica Echevarria. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stokes, Kelsey)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 Letter to Robert Price re: Non-Admitted Status. (afd)
July 17, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jessica Echevarria. (afd)
July 17, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11018065). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Jessica Echevarria. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stokes, Kelsey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Echevarria v. Davol, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davol, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Echevarria
Represented By: Kelsey Louise Stokes
Represented By: Robert E. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?